This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 08:28:23 (UTC).

Comsys Solutions LLC v. Smart Eye International Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Comsys Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Smart Eye International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00743

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Comsys Solutions LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Smart Eye International Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Howard L. Wernow

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) SO ORDERED Granting #11 Joint Motion to Dismiss (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/29/2022. (nms) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#11

(#11) Joint Motion to Dismiss - filed by Comsys Solutions LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) Modified on 7/29/2022 (nms). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaims, by Comsys Solutions LLC.(Chong, Jimmy) Modified on 7/21/2022 (nms). (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Smart Eye AB for Smart Eye International Inc. filed by Smart Eye International Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Comsys Solutions LLC by Smart Eye International Inc..(Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comsys Solutions LLC. Smart Eye International Inc. served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Comsys Solutions LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Related Cases

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,324,096; US 9,672,535. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SO ORDERED Granting #11 Joint Motion to Dismiss (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/29/2022. (nms) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Motion to Dismiss - filed by Comsys Solutions LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) Modified on 7/29/2022 (nms). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaims, by Comsys Solutions LLC.(Chong, Jimmy) Modified on 7/21/2022 (nms). (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Smart Eye AB for Smart Eye International Inc. filed by Smart Eye International Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Comsys Solutions LLC by Smart Eye International Inc..(Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comsys Solutions LLC. Smart Eye International Inc. served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Comsys Solutions LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00743-RGA, 1:22-cv-00745-RGA(twk) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (D.I. 6 in 22-cv-743-RGA; D.I. 6 in 22-cv-745-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow, filed by Comsys Solutions LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00743-RGA, 1:22-cv-00745-RGA(nms) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Comsys Solutions LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00743-RGA, 1:22-cv-00745-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Smart Eye International Inc. on 6/6/2022. (srs) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Comsys Solutions LLC. (srs) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,324,096 ;US 9,672,535. (srs) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against Smart Eye International Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3889827.) - filed by Comsys Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Related Cases, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Douglas Anderson