This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2022 at 08:28:37 (UTC).

Compton v. OS Restaurant Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Compton filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against OS Restaurant Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Gregory J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00389

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZABETH COMPTON

Defendants

OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC, a Foreign Limited Liability Company

BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC., a Foreign Profit Corporation, and

BONEFISH GRILL, LLC., a Florida Limited Liability Company,

OS Restaurant Services, LLC

Bloomin' Brands, Inc.

Bonefish Grill, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelly Hagan Chanfrau

Attorney at Chanfrau and Chanfrau

701 North Peninsula Drive

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Bermel Dunlap

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

111 North Orange Avenue, Suite 1750

Orlando, FL 33602

Lauren C. Robertson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

111 N. Orange Avenue, Suite 1750

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court - Volusia County, case number 2021 31306 CICI filed in State Court on 10/12/21. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19261874 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court Amended Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunlap, Nicole) Modified on 2/23/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Elizabeth Compton. (Chanfrau, Kelly) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of a Related Action pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(c) by Elizabeth Compton. Related cases: yes (Chanfrau, Kelly) Modified on 2/24/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#5

(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/24/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER. Standing Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/24/2022. (CRC) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint (Amended) by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC, OS Restaurant Services, LLC.(Robertson, Lauren) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Nicole Bermel Dunlap on behalf of Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC, OS Restaurant Services, LLC. Lead Counsel: Nicole Bermel Dunlap. (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC, OS Restaurant Services, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC, OS Restaurant Services, LLC identifying Other Affiliate OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC for Bloomin' Brands, Inc.. (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Robertson, Lauren) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 5/27/2022 Discovery due by 4/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2023 Pretrial statement due by 8/15/2023 All other motions due by 8/22/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2023 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/17/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/7/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/13/2023 @ 10:00 a.m. before Carlos Burruezo. (Chanfrau, Kelly) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/13/2023 @ 10:00 a.m. before Carlos Burruezo. (Chanfrau, Kelly) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docket(#14) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Carlos Burruezo appointed as mediator. (RDO) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 5/27/2022 Discovery due by 4/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2023 Pretrial statement due by 8/15/2023 All other motions due by 8/22/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2023 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/17/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/7/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Robertson, Lauren) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC, OS Restaurant Services, LLC identifying Other Affiliate OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC for Bloomin' Brands, Inc.. (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC, OS Restaurant Services, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Nicole Bermel Dunlap on behalf of Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC, OS Restaurant Services, LLC. Lead Counsel: Nicole Bermel Dunlap. (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to counsel Lauren Robertson of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RDO) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint (Amended) by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC, OS Restaurant Services, LLC.(Robertson, Lauren) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. Standing Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/24/2022. (CRC) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/24/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of a Related Action pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(c) by Elizabeth Compton. Related cases: yes (Chanfrau, Kelly) Modified on 2/24/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Elizabeth Compton. (Chanfrau, Kelly) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0389-PGB-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court - Volusia County, case number 2021 31306 CICI filed in State Court on 10/12/21. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19261874 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court Amended Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunlap, Nicole) Modified on 2/23/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC DOING BUSINESS AS CARRABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL is a litigant

Latest cases where Bonefish Grill, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bloomin' Brands, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Bermel Dunlap(Designation Retained)