This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 07:48:52 (UTC).

Composite Resources, Inc. v. Rood

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Composite Resources, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Rood. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00500

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC

JOHN CALEB ROOD, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARK O. MORRIS

Sid Leach

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

William Young Klett, III

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

1221 Main Street, Suite 1800

Columbia, SC 29201

Mark O Morris

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER

15 W South Temple #1200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101-1004

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit A

9 #9

Main Document

#7

(#7) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Sid Leach. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2338648.)Mark O Morris appearing for Plaintiff COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. Responses due by 2/22/2022 (Morris, Mark)

#6

(#6) ORDER PERMITTING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE - The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Authorization of Alternative Service of Process (Dkt. #5 ) as follows: Plaintiff shall effectuate service of process upon Defendant by publication under Idaho law as proposed in the motion. Plaintiff shall also carry out service of process upon Defendant under Nevada law, by serving the summons and complaint on the counsel who represent Defendants company before the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada identified as case number 21-14382-nmc. If Plaintiff chooses, he may file a copy of summons complaint on the docket of the bankruptcy proceeding, but need not do so to effect service. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

5 #2

Exhibit Form of Order

5 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark O. Morris

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. (Morris, Mark)

3 #1

Complaint

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to JOHN CALEB ROOD, JR. USM 285 Sent to USM (Print attached Summons for service.) (lm)

1 #6

Supplement Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving (Dkt. #9 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney William Klett for COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by William Y. Klett, III. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2339715.)Mark O Morris appearing for Plaintiff COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. Responses due by 2/22/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morris, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Entry Order Approving (Dkt. #7 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Sid Leach for COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Sid Leach. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2338648.)Mark O Morris appearing for Plaintiff COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. Responses due by 2/22/2022 (Morris, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER PERMITTING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE - The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Authorization of Alternative Service of Process (Dkt. #5 ) as follows: Plaintiff shall effectuate service of process upon Defendant by publication under Idaho law as proposed in the motion. Plaintiff shall also carry out service of process upon Defendant under Nevada law, by serving the summons and complaint on the counsel who represent Defendants company before the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada identified as case number 21-14382-nmc. If Plaintiff chooses, he may file a copy of summons complaint on the docket of the bankruptcy proceeding, but need not do so to effect service. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT and Ex Parte Motion for Authorization of Alternative Service of Process by COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark O. Morris, #2 Exhibit Form of Order)(Morris, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. (Morris, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)7,842,067, 7,892,253, 8,888,807 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to JOHN CALEB ROOD, JR. USM 285 Sent to USM (Print attached Summons for service.) (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN CALEB ROOD, JR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2318742.), filed by COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Supplement Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Morris, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Composite Resources, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sid Leach

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Y Klett, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark O. Morris