This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:34:54 (UTC).

COMPONENT ENTERPRISES, CO., INC., FAIRHILL CABLE PRODUCTS, INC. T/A VICTOR INDUSTRIES, PENN & ARCH, LLC., AND/OR THEODORE & JOHN HOFFMAN, THEODORE HOFFMAN, HOFFMANOPOLY, LLC., AND COMPONENT ENTERPRISE v. SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 COMPONENT ENTERPRISES, CO , INC , FAIRHILL CABLE PRODUCTS, INC T/A VICTOR INDUSTRIES, PENN ARCH, LLC , AND/OR THEODORE JOHN HOFFMAN, THEODORE HOFFMAN, HOFFMANOPOLY, LLC , AND COMPONENT ENTERPRISE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05206

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPONENT ENTERPRISES, CO., INC., FAIRHILL CABLE PRODUCTS, INC. T/A VICTOR INDUSTRIES, PENN & ARCH, LLC., AND/OR THEODORE & JOHN HOFFMAN, THEODORE HOFFMAN, HOFFMANOPOLY, LLC., AND COMPONENT ENTERPRISE

COMPONENT ENTERPRISES CO INC, FAIRHILL CABLE PRODUCTS INC T/A VICTOR INDUSTRIES, PENN & ARCH LLC AND/OR THEODORE & JOHN HOFFMAN, THEODORE HOFFMAN, HOFFMANOPOLY LLC, AND COMPONENT ENTERPRISES CO INC 40

Defendant

SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL W. BALLARD, JR.

Attorney at MERLIN LAW GROUP

125 Half Mile Road, Suite 201

Red Bank, NJ 07701

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS J. SEERY

Attorney at Kennedys CMK LLC

1600 Market Street, Suite 1410

Philadelphia, PA 19103

KATRINE L. HYDE

Attorney at KENNEDYS CMK LLP

120 Mountain View Boulevard

Basking Ridge, BH 07920

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO ADMIT KATRINE L. HYDE, ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY IS GRANTED. MS. HYDE IS ADMITTED IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/18/22.1/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

8 #3

Certificate of Service

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 4/12/2022 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5D.(sah) (Entered: 01/09/2022)

6 #1

Consent Form

6 #6

Main Document

5 #4

ATTACHMENT

5 #3

ATTACHMENT

5 #2

ATTACHMENT

5 #1

ATTACHMENT

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILLED IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/3/21. 12/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

3 #3

Main Document

2 #1

Arbitration Certification Form

2 #2

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO ADMIT KATRINE L. HYDE, ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY IS GRANTED. MS. HYDE IS ADMITTED IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/18/22.1/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Katrine L. Hyde, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15665426.) filed by SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SEERY, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 4/12/2022 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5D.(sah) (Entered: 01/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(mcos, ) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT, #2 ATTACHMENT, #3 ATTACHMENT, #4 ATTACHMENT)(sg, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILLED IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/3/21. 12/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint WITH NEW MATTER by SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(SEERY, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, ) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15571768), filed by SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Certificate of Service)(SEERY, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Way Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS J. SEERY