This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2020 at 08:16:33 (UTC).

Complete Merchant Solutions v. Federal Trade Commission

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Complete Merchant Solutions filed an Other lawsuit against Federal Trade Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Romero, Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Evelyn J. Furse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00963

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Evelyn J. Furse

Presiding Judges

Cecilia M. Romero

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Complete Merchant Solutions

Defendant

Federal Trade Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jess M. Krannich

Attorney at MANNING CURTIS BRADSHAW & BEDNAR PLLC

136 E South Temple Ste 1300

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Kristin Rose

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

555 S Flower St 37Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark Holscher

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

555 S Flower St 37Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Diana Torres

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

2049 Century Park East 37Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew Gamsin

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

555 S Flower St 37Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Allison W. Buchner

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

2049 Century Park East 37Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Michael D. Bergman

Attorney at FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION

600 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20580

 

Court Documents

#34

33 #1

Exhibit 1 - 12/30/2019 Email From Kristin Rose attaching draft Attorney Planning

#33

#32

31 #3

Exhibit C - Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission and Consent of Local

27 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Propose Schedule

#27

22 #2

Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form

22 #1

Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/14/2020. (las) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time To Propose Schedule and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Complete Merchant Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12/30/2019 Email From Kristin Rose attaching draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - 01/06/2020 Email from Michael Bergman in Response to 12/30/2019 Email)(Buchner, Allison) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Holscher for Complete Merchant Solutions. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov; granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Holscher for Complete Merchant Solutions. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/9/2020. (las) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Holscher , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3449234, filed by Plaintiff Complete Merchant Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission and Consent of Local Counsel)(Krannich, Jess) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to respond to Defendant's #27 Motion to Extend Time to Propose Schedule by the close of business on January 13, 2020. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/8/2020. (nas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to comply with the Notice of Deficiency at ECF No. 25 no later than January 13, 2020. If the missing information is not provided by that date, the #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission will be denied. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/8/2020. (nas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#28) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 1/7/2020. (las) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Extension of Time To Propose Schedule and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Propose Schedule)(Bergman, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#26) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Holscher , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3449234. The document Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission is incomplete, page (1) of Exhibit A; Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice missing answer if currently suspended or disbarred in any state. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading using the same receipt number from the previous motion. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Complete Merchant Solutions (Krannich, Jess) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #8 Affidavit of Service, and #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. The document Summons Returned Executed and Affidavit of Service. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading Summons Returned Executed filer must select party served, not all defendants and enter date party was served, the answer date will be calculated automatically. The Affidavit of Service must be refiled as Summons Returned Executed as to USA and the date of service entered and the summons attached. The new pleadings will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint, Summons, Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on William Barr, United States Attorney General, Federal Trade Commission, Civil Process Clerk-United States Attorney's Office on 12/11/2019, filed by Plaintiff Complete Merchant Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Delivery Confirmation)(Krannich, Jess) Modified on 12/16/2019 stricken, wrong event used, no served party selected, no date of service entered, no summons attached. (nl). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STRICKEN **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Complete Merchant Solutions. All Defendants. (Krannich, Jess) Modified on 12/16/2019 stricken, no party selected, no service date entered, counsel to refile(nl). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/6/2019. (las) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Mark C. Holscher, Diana Torres, Kristin Rose and Matthew Gamsin, for Plaintiff Complete Merchant Solutions (tlh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Trade Commission. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Complete Merchant Solutions identifying CMS Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Krannich, Jess) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3434690) filed by Complete Merchant Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Krannich, Jess) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Complete Merchant Solutions is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE MERCHANT SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Daniel Bergman