Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2021 at 20:02:12 (UTC).

Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. v. Business Capital, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Business Capital, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-60542

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Complete Business Solutions, Inc.

Defendants

Business Capital, LLC

HSI Capital, LLC

Main Street Capital Group, LLC

24 Hour Capital, Inc.

Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC

Tzvi Pershin

Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc.

MP RE 770, LLC

Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc.

Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.

Tonmoy Sharma

Vedenta Laboratories, Inc.

Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.

Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.

Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc.

Shreya Health of Florida, Inc.

Kingsman Insurance Company, Inc.

Shreya Health of California

John Doe(s) #1-100

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Craig Pugatch

Attorney at Rice Pugatch Robinson Storfer & Cohen, PLLC

101 Ne 3 Avenue, Suite 1800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Mendy Menachem Piekarski

Attorney at Sichenzia Ross Ference, LLP

1185 Avenue Of The America, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Todd J. Manister

Attorney at Sichenzia Ross Ference LLP

1185 Avenue Of The America, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Richard Bernard Storfer

Attorney at Rice Pugatch Robinson Storfer & Cohen, PLLC

101 Ne 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Other Attorneys

Sheldon J Burnett

17111 Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 1711, North Miami Beach

North Miami Beach, FL 33160

Roger Slade

Attorney at Haber Slade, P.A.

251 Nw 23Rd St

Miami, FL 33127

Michael J. Liss

Attorney at Kalis & Kleiman

7320 Griffin Road, Suite 109

Davie, FL 33314

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions are denied as MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. (Liss, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Liss on behalf of Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. Attorney Michael J. Liss added to party Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.(pty:pla). (Liss, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #16 Motion.( Responses due by 4/18/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

16 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

16 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

16 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

16 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#16

(#16) First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Business Capital, LLC. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin of Defendants who have Joined in or Consented to Removal (Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mendy Menachem Piekarski and Todd J. Manister. Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 113C-11453691 by 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#6

(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by March 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES( Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/25/2019), (Defendants' response due 3/7/2019) (Motion to Remand due by 4/1/2019.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Bernard Storfer on behalf of 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin (Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#3

(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Sheldon J. Burnett, mailing date March 1, 2019, (pt) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#16) First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Business Capital, LLC. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions are denied as MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. (Liss, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Liss on behalf of Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. Attorney Michael J. Liss added to party Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.(pty:pla). (Liss, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #16 Motion.( Responses due by 4/18/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Order granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO #11 MOTION.( Responses due by 4/3/2019). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Business Capital, LLC re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Business Capital, LLC. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grimble & Loguidice, LLC (Slade, Roger) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin of Defendants who have Joined in or Consented to Removal (Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mendy Menachem Piekarski and Todd J. Manister. Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 113C-11453691 by 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Reset Deadlines 24 Hour Capital, Inc. answer due 3/27/2019; Business Capital, LLC answer due 3/27/2019; Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc. answer due 3/27/2019; HSI Capital, LLC answer due 3/27/2019; Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC answer due 3/27/2019; Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc. answer due 3/27/2019 Per DE#7. (cqs) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by March 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin. (Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES( Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/25/2019), (Defendants' response due 3/7/2019) (Motion to Remand due by 4/1/2019.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Bernard Storfer on behalf of 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin (Storfer, Richard) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Sheldon J. Burnett, mailing date March 1, 2019, (pt) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11435482, filed by Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, HSI Capital, LLC, 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pugatch, Craig) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant