This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2020 at 08:30:51 (UTC).

Commworks Solutions, LLC v. Mediacom Communications Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Commworks Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mediacom Communications Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07529

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Commworks Solutions, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Mediacom Communications Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Dmitry A. Kheyfits

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Brandon Gregory Moore

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

108 Wild Basin Road South, Suite 250

Austin, TX 78746

Andrey Belenky

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Hanna Glomska Cohen

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Amr O. Aly

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

919 Third Avenue, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

18 #1

Appendix Proposed Scheduling Order

#18

#16

15 #3

Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

15 #2

Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FOR BRANDON G. MOORE

15 #1

Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF BRANDON G. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ADMIT

#15

1 #22

Exhibit 13

1 #18

Exhibit 9

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Commworks Solutions, LLC. Document filed by Mediacom Communications Corporation..(Aly, Amr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mediacom Communications Corporation..(Aly, Amr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from CommWorks Solutions, LLC and Mediacom Communications Corporation dated November 12, 2020 re: Pre-Scheduling Conference. Document filed by Commworks Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Scheduling Order).(Belenky, Andrey) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Brandon G. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held on November 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/5/2020) (cf) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Brandon G. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CommWorks Solutions, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21960777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Brandon G. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CommWorks Solutions, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21960777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commworks Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF BRANDON G. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, #2 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FOR BRANDON G. MOORE, #3 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE).(Moore, Brandon) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hanna Glomska Cohen on behalf of Commworks Solutions, LLC..(Cohen, Hanna) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is GRANTED. By November 12, 2020, Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The parties' attention is directed to the requirement for pre-motion letters per Individual Rule III.A.1. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/30/2020) Mediacom Communications Corporation answer due 11/12/2020 (ks) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, from October 12, 2020 to November 12, 2020 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Amr O. Aly dated September 29, 2020. Document filed by Mediacom Communications Corporation..(Aly, Amr) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCase Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mediacom Communications Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Commworks Solutions, LLC..(Kheyfits, Dmitry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Brainbox Innovations, LLC for Commworks Solutions, LLC. Document filed by Commworks Solutions, LLC..(Kheyfits, Dmitry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kheyfits, Dmitry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kheyfits, Dmitry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kheyfits, Dmitry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mediacom Communications Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21643912)Document filed by Commworks Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit 2, #12 Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit 7, #17 Exhibit 8, #18 Exhibit 9, #19 Exhibit 10, #20 Exhibit 11, #21 Exhibit 12, #22 Exhibit 13).(Kheyfits, Dmitry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CommWorks Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mediacom Communications Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dmitry A. Kheyfits

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Gregory Moore