This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 15:20:45 (UTC).

COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC. et al v. RUSS et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against RUSS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christina Reiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00490

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina Reiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.

AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.

Defendants and Cross Claimants

ACTUARIAL CONSULTING SERVICES, INC.

JOANN RUSS

THE BURKE GROUP OF ROCHESTER, INC.

MUTUAL OF AMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

THE 403(B) THRIFT PLAN OF NYSARC, INC

NYSARC, INC.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

THE BURKE GROUP OF ROCHESTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Jude Zawodzinski

Attorney at Hodgson Russ LLP

The Guaranty Building, 140 Pearl Street, Suite 100

Buffalo, NY 14202

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Thomas J. Gaffney

Attorney at Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700

Buffalo, NY 14202

Matthew D. Miller

Attorney at Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC

424 Main Street, Suite 1600

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#30

10 #8

Exhibit H

10 #7

Exhibit G

10 #6

Exhibit F

10 #5

Exhibit E

10 #4

Exhibit D

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#2

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B (Redacted)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against THE BURKE GROUP OF ROCHESTER, INC. by ACTUARIAL CONSULTING SERVICES, INC..(Gaffney, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting extension of time for defendant, JoAnn Russ's time to answer or otherwise move through and including, June 23, 2021. Signed by Hon. Christina Reiss on 5/28/21. (SG) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION re #10 Amended Complaint,, and Order for Extension of Time by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. (Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Sandy Glendenning - 403(B) Thrift Plan of NYSARC, Inc. on 05/17/2021, filed by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. (Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Sandy Glendenning - NYSARC Inc. on 05/17/2021, filed by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. (Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION AND ORDER that defendant, The Burke Group of Rochester, Inc.'s time to move or answer plaintiff's amended verified complaint is hereby extended through and including, June 28, 2021. Signed by Hon. Christina Reiss on 5/14/21. (SG) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION re #10 Amended Complaint,, STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT THROUGH June 23, 2021 by JOANN RUSS. (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Miller on behalf of JOANN RUSS (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION re #10 Amended Complaint,, and Order for Extension of Time by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. (Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER Actuarial Consulting Services, Inc.'s time to move or answer plaintiffs' amended verified complaint is hereby extended through and including, June 10, 2021. Signed by Hon. Christina Reiss on 5/12/21. (SG) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhbits A-H and Amended Verification served on The Burke Group of Rochester, Inc. on 04/20/2021, filed by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. (Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summos and Verified Complaint served on Bridget Brouillette on 04/20/2021, filed by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. (Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED DOCUMENT by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. Amendment to #2 Continuation of Exhibits, #1 Complaint,, Correction to Verification of Verified Complaint. (Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to JOANN RUSS. (SG) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ACTUARIAL CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., MUTUAL OF AMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE BURKE GROUP OF ROCHESTER, INC.. (LMD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (LMD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Christina Reiss. Notification to Chambers of on-line case opening. (LMD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. to #1 Complaint,, Summons to Complaint filed by AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4216205, filed by COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC., AUDIT, FINANCE, AND PENSION COMMITTEE OF THE COMMUNITY ACTION ORGANIZATION OF WESTERN NEW YORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Exhibit C (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Zawodzinski, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mutual of America Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Jude Zawodzinski