This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:23:14 (UTC).

Communications Workers of America v. AT&T Mobility Services LLC

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 Communications Workers of America filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against AT T Mobility Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas W. Thrash, Jr and Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Communications Workers of America

Defendant

AT&T Mobility Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Moore Weaver

Attorney at CWA District 3

4100 Perimeter Park S

Atlanta, GA 30341

Defendant Attorney

Eric Schultz

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3424 Peachtree Rd, Ne, Ste 1200

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Communications Workers of America (Weaver, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, the Court instead DIRECTS the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal upon finalization of the settlement documents. If settlement fails, the Parties should promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/22/22. (rlh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AT&T Mobility Services LLC Answer due 4/22/2022. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/11/22. (bnw) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Schultz on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services LLC (Schultz, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

5 #5

Main Document

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Communications Workers of America. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11492265). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet).(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/04/2022)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Communications Workers of America (Weaver, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (rlh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, the Court instead DIRECTS the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal upon finalization of the settlement documents. If settlement fails, the Parties should promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/22/22. (rlh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, with Brief In Support by AT&T Mobility Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schultz, Eric) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AT&T Mobility Services LLC Answer due 4/22/2022. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/11/22. (bnw) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Schultz on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services LLC (Schultz, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by AT&T Mobility Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schultz, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRefund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 1/19/2022 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-19-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/10/2022. (anc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Approval re #2 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11492188. (Weaver, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Communications Workers of America. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11492265). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet).(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Schultz