This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:49:53 (UTC).

Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO v. Dex Media Inc

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Dex Media Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03295

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO

Defendants

Dex Media, Inc.

Dex Media Inc doing business as Thryv Inc

Counter Claimant

Dex Media Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David Van Os

Attorney at David Van Os & Associates PC

8626 Tesoro Drive, Suite 510

San Antonio, TX 78217

Rod Tanner

Attorney at Tanner and Associates PC

6300 Ridglea Place, Suite 407

Fort Worth, TX 76116-5706

Matt Holder

Attorney at David Van Os & Associates PC

8626 Tesoro Drive, Suite 510

San Antonio, TX 78217

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Rachel M Hoffer

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Milam Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#11

(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Dex Media Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO filed by Dex Media Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Hoffer, Rachel) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dex Media Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Thryv Holdings, Inc. for Dex Media Inc. (Hoffer, Rachel) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dex Media Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hoffer, Rachel) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Dex Media Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Rachel M Hoffer added to party Dex Media Inc(pty:dft) (Hoffer, Rachel) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Dex Media Inc. (hml) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO. (Van Os, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO. (Van Os, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dex Media, Inc. filed by Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11318277) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Van Os, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Dex Media Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO filed by Dex Media Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Hoffer, Rachel) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Dex Media, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 12/28/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/25/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave. Accordingly, Defendant may proceed without designating local counsel in this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/25/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dex Media Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Thryv Holdings, Inc. for Dex Media Inc. (Hoffer, Rachel) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dex Media Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hoffer, Rachel) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Dex Media Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Rachel M Hoffer added to party Dex Media Inc(pty:dft) (Hoffer, Rachel) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Dex Media Inc. (hml) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO. (Van Os, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO. (Van Os, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dex Media, Inc. filed by Communications Workers of America AFL-CIO. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11318277) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Van Os, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases where Dex Media, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Megan Hoffer(Designation Retained)