This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2021 at 11:15:25 (UTC).

COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC et al v. Q3 NETWORKING LLC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC filed an Other lawsuit against Q3 NETWORKING LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-MC-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Petitioners

COMMSCOPE, INC.

ARRIS US HOLDINGS INC

NETGEAR, INC.

RUCKUS WIRELESS INC

COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC

HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY

ARUBA NETWORKS LLC

Respondent

Q3 NETWORKING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Calvin M. Brien

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

2 #8

Notice to Counsel/Party of Related Civil Case

2 #7

Declaration NETGEAR

2 #6

Declaration for HPE

2 #5

Declaration for CommScope

2 #4

Text of Proposed Order

2 #3

Exhibit B

2 #2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Memorandum in Support

#2

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 49.00, receipt number: 4616104998. (eg) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letters Rogatory Issued granting Motion #2 for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zcal) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance by ARRIS US HOLDINGS INC, ARUBA NETWORKS LLC, COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC, COMMSCOPE, INC., HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY, NETGEAR, INC., RUCKUS WIRELESS INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Declaration for CommScope, #6 Declaration for HPE, #7 Declaration NETGEAR, #8 Notice to Counsel/Party of Related Civil Case)(Brien, Calvin) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; emailed to calvin.brien@morganlewis.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Filing fee for miscellaneous case not paid. Please remit filing fee payment via check or money order. In the future, do not file these kinds of cases electronically. (zsb, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance by ARRIS US HOLDINGS INC, ARUBA NETWORKS LLC, COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC, COMMSCOPE, INC., HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY, NETGEAR, INC., RUCKUS WIRELESS INC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Brien, Calvin) Modified on 1/21/2021 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Q3 NETWORKING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC is a litigant