This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2021 at 01:57:48 (UTC).

COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA et al v. FERRIERO

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA filed an Other lawsuit against FERRIERO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA

STATE OF NEVADA

STATE OF ILLINOIS

Petitioners and Intervenor Defendants

NEBRASKA

LOUISIANA

ALABAMA

SOUTH DAKOTA

TENNESSEE

BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC.

VICE MEDIA LLC

POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER

ARAB WOMEN ORGANIZATION

VOTEERA.ORG

DAYFORWARD INC.

ILLINOIS NOW

NATIONAL IMMIGRANT WOMEN'S ADVOCACY PROJECT, INC.

Defendant

DAVID S. FERRIERO

Amicus Curiae

STATE OF DELAWARE

STATE OF HAWAII

STATE OF MARYLAND

239 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michelle S. Kallen

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL/VA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Martine Elizabeth Cicconi

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL/VA

202 North Ninth Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Jessica Merry Samuels

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL/VA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Toby Jay Heytens

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL/VA

202 North Ninth Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Christopher Graham Wells

Attorney at ILLINOIS ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

100 W. Randolph St.

Chicago, IL 60601

Elizabeth Roberson-Young

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL/IL

100 W. Randolph Street, 11Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Kathryn Hunt Muse

Attorney at ILLINOIS ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

100 W. Randolph St.

Chicago, IL 60601

Petitioner and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Cameron Thomas Norris

Attorney at CONSOVOY MCCARTHY PLLC

1600 Wilson Blvd., Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

James A. Campbell

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL/NE

2115 State Capitol

Lincoln, NE 68509

Elizabeth Baker Murrill

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL/LA

P.O. Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804

James William Davis

Attorney at STATE OF ALABAMA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL

P.O. Box 300152, 501 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

Alexander Barrett Bowdre

Attorney at STATE OF ALABAMA

501 Washington Ave., Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

Kelsey Curtis

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR ALABAMA

501 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36104

Patrick Neilson Strawbridge

Attorney at CONSOVOY MCCARTHY PLLC

Ten Post Office Square, 8Th Floor South Pmb #706

Boston, MA 02109

Edmund G. LaCour, Jr

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL/AL

Po Box 300152, 501 Washington Ave

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

Andree Sophia Blumstein

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE/TN

Po Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Vanessa Tussey

Attorney at BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER LLP

401 East Las Olas Blvd., Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Stuart Harold Singer

Attorney at BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jon Lester Mills

2727 Nw 58Th Blvd

Gainesville, FL 32606

Other Attorneys

Jade E. Sipes

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON, BEARMAN, CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, PC

420 Twentieth Street North, Suite 1400

Birmingham, AL 35203

35 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#120

(#120) Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #119 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztth) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#119

(#119) NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #116 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #117 Memorandum & Opinion, by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEVADA. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-8417214. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Kallen, Michelle) Modified on 5/7/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#118

(#118) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, HERSHEY COMPANY, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC.. (Bergmann, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#117

(#117) MEMORANDUM OPINION granting #29 the Archivist's motion to dismiss; granting #74 Intervenors' motion for summary judgment construed as a motion to dismiss; denying #100 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; denying #88 Intervenors' unopposed motion to consolidate hearings; denying #104 the Archivist's motion to stay summary-judgment briefing; and granting #31 , #40 , #44 , #48 , #51 , #61 , #66 , #68 , #73 , #90 , #91 , #94 , #96 , #108 amici's motions for leave to file amicus briefs. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#116

(#116) ORDER granting #29 the Archivist's motion to dismiss; granting #74 Intervenors' motion for summary judgment construed as a motion to dismiss; denying #100 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; denying #88 Intervenors' unopposed motion to consolidate hearings; denying #104 the Archivist's motion to stay summary-judgment briefing; and granting #31 , #40 , #44 , #48 , #51 , #61 , #66 , #68 , #73 , #90 , #91 , #94 , #96 , #108 amici's motions for leave to file amicus briefs. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

100 #4

Text of Proposed Order

#94

(#116) ORDER granting #29 the Archivist's motion to dismiss; granting #74 Intervenors' motion for summary judgment construed as a motion to dismiss; denying #100 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; denying #88 Intervenors' unopposed motion to consolidate hearings; denying #104 the Archivist's motion to stay summary-judgment briefing; and granting #31 , #40 , #44 , #48 , #51 , #61 , #66 , #68 , #73 , #90 , #91 , #94 , #96 , #108 amici's motions for leave to file amicus briefs. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

68 #4

Text of Proposed Order

40 #3

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) ERRATA by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kallen, Michelle) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Roberson-Young on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Roberson-Young, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Graham Wells on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Hunt Muse on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Muse, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DAVID S. FERRIERO (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kallen, Michelle) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

261 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSCA Case Number 21-5096 for #119 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by STATE OF NEVADA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS. (ztth) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #119 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztth) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #116 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #117 Memorandum & Opinion, by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEVADA. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-8417214. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Kallen, Michelle) Modified on 5/7/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, HERSHEY COMPANY, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC.. (Bergmann, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) MEMORANDUM OPINION granting #29 the Archivist's motion to dismiss; granting #74 Intervenors' motion for summary judgment construed as a motion to dismiss; denying #100 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; denying #88 Intervenors' unopposed motion to consolidate hearings; denying #104 the Archivist's motion to stay summary-judgment briefing; and granting #31 , #40 , #44 , #48 , #51 , #61 , #66 , #68 , #73 , #90 , #91 , #94 , #96 , #108 amici's motions for leave to file amicus briefs. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) ORDER granting #29 the Archivist's motion to dismiss; granting #74 Intervenors' motion for summary judgment construed as a motion to dismiss; denying #100 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; denying #88 Intervenors' unopposed motion to consolidate hearings; denying #104 the Archivist's motion to stay summary-judgment briefing; and granting #31 , #40 , #44 , #48 , #51 , #61 , #66 , #68 , #73 , #90 , #91 , #94 , #96 , #108 amici's motions for leave to file amicus briefs. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS. Attorney Elizabeth J. Cappiello terminated. (Cappiello, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Folds on behalf of 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Folds, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) AFFIDAVIT re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE. (Norris, Cameron) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) REPLY to opposition to motion re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE. (Norris, Cameron) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Toby Jay Heytens on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Heytens, Toby) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Merry Samuels on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Samuels, Jessica) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DAVID S. FERRIERO. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Martine Elizabeth Cicconi on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Cicconi, Martine) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ERRATA by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kallen, Michelle) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Roberson-Young on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Roberson-Young, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Graham Wells on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Hunt Muse on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Muse, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DAVID S. FERRIERO (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kallen, Michelle) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Policy Analysis Center is a litigant

Latest cases where TENNESSEE is a litigant

Latest cases where Vice Media, LLC is a litigant