This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 08:01:02 (UTC).

COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al v. SCALIA et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against SCALIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00258

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

STATE OF MARYLAND

STATE OF ILLINOIS

DANA NESSEL

COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA

STATE OF NEW YORK

COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS

STATE OF DELAWARE

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

EUGENE SCALIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NANCY A. WALKER

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

RYAN BLAKE SMITH

Attorney at PA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL

1600 Arch Street, 3Rd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

LYDIA COLUNGA-MERCHANT

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ILLINOIS ATTORNEY GENERAL

100 W. Randolph St., 11Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

AMANDA MOREJON

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108

CHRISTOPHER S. HALLOCK

Attorney at PA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSEPH WARDENSKI

Attorney at NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

28 Liberty St

New York, NY 10005

JEFFREY PAUL DUNLAP

Attorney at MARYLAND OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

200 St Paul Place - 20Th Fl

Baltimore, MD 21202

ZACHARY A. RISK

Attorney at MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

P.O. Box 30736

Lansing, MI 48909

ESTELLE BRONSTEIN

Attorney at NJ DEPT LAW & PUBLIC SAFETY DIV LAW

25 Market St, Pobox 112

Trenton, NJ 08625-0112

KATHLEEN M. KONOPKA

Attorney at DC OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Public Advocacy Division, 10Th Floor, 400 6Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

ALVAR AYALA

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ILLINOIS ATTORNEY GENERAL

100 W Randolph St 11Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60601

VANESSA L. KASSAB

Attorney at DELAWARE DEPT. OF JUSTICE

Carvel State Bldg., 820 N. French St., 5Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

OLIVIA R. HUSSEY SCOTT

Attorney at U.S DEPT OF JUSTICE, CIVIL DIVISION

1100 L Street, N.W., Room 11112

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#24

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#17

#15

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER THAT THE MATTER IS PLACED IN SUSPENSE. DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF LABOR IS REQUIRED TO SUBMIT A STATUS REPORT IN 60 DAYS AND EVERY 60 DAYS THEREAFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/19/21. 3/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Deadline to Answer the Complaint filed by EUGENE SCALIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCOTT, OLIVIA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ESTELLE BRONSTEIN, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #15 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/2/21.2/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF LYDIA COLUNGA-MERCHANT, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #20 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/2/21.2/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Lydia Colunga-Merchant (IL) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14883486.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ALVAR AYALA, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #17 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/29/21.2/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JEFFREY P. DUNLAP, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #16 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/29/21.2/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Alvar Ayala (Illinois) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14880405.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Dunlap (Maryland) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14879418.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Estelle Bronstein (New Jersey) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14877068.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KATHLEEN KONOPKA, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/25/21.1/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Amanda Morejn (Massachusetts) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14866447.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Joseph Wardenski (New York) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14865674.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Kathleen Konopka (Washington DC) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14865189.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, DANA NESSEL, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK re #1 Complaint (Attorney), by certified mail (SMITH, RYAN) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by VANESSA L. KASSAB on behalf of STATE OF DELAWARE (KASSAB, VANESSA) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to EUGENE SCALIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/20/21. SUMMONS E-MAILED TO AUSA ON 1/20/2021. (bw, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN BLAKE SMITH on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(SMITH, RYAN) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14852289.), filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, DANA NESSEL, STATE OF MARYLAND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(WALKER, NANCY) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olivia R. Hussey Scott