This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2021 at 10:05:35 (UTC).

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania et al v. 3M et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Commonwealth of Pennsylvania filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against 3M. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01977

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania

PRIMOS-SECANE WESTBROOK PARK FIRE COMPANY #5 OF UPPER DARBY PENNSYLVANIA, INC.

DELAWARE COUNTY

Defendants

E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company

The Chemours Company

The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.

Dupont De Nemours Inc

Corteva Inc

Chemguard Inc

Tyco Fire Products L.P.

Kiddie-Fenwal Inc

Kidde PLC Inc

Chubb Fire LTD

Carrier Global Corporation

Raytheon Technologies Corporation

National Foam Inc

Buckeye Fire Equipment Company

Arkema Inc

BASF Corporation

ChemDesign Products Inc

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon J Taylor

Attorney at Cossich Sumich Parsiola and Taylor LLC

8397 Highway 23Suite 100

Belle Chasse, LA 70037

Christina Cossich

Attorney at Cossich Sumich Parsiola and Taylor LLC

8397 Highway 23Suite 100

Belle Chasse, LA 70037

Darren D Sumich

Attorney at Cossich Sumich Parsiola and Taylor LLC

8397 Highway 23Suite 100

Belle Chasse, LA 70037

David A Parsiola

Attorney at Cossich Sumich Parsiola and Taylor LLC

8397 Highway 23Suite 100

Belle Chasse, LA 70037

Jerry R DeSiderato

Attorney at Dilworth Paxson LLP

1500 Market Streetsuite 3500E

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Luana N Smith

Attorney at Cossich Sumich Parsiola and Taylor LLC

8397 Highway 23Suite 100

Belle Chasse, LA 70037

Philip F Cossich

Attorney at Cossich Sumich Parsiola and Taylor LLC

8397 Highway 23Suite 100

Belle Chasse, LA 70037

Defendant Attorney

Kerri E Chewning

Attorney at Archer and Greiner

One Centennial Square

Haddonfield, NJ 08033-0968

 

Court Documents

#1837

#14

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

#4

#2

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

#1767

#1766

#1765

#1764

#1763

#1762

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporations General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corp, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Darren D Sumich on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, DELAWARE COUNTY, PRIMOS-SECANE WESTBROOK PARK FIRE COMPANY #5 OF UPPER DARBY PENNSYLVANIA, INC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01977-RMG(Sumich, Darren) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, DELAWARE COUNTY, PRIMOS-SECANE WESTBROOK PARK FIRE COMPANY #5 OF UPPER DARBY PENNSYLVANIA, INC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01977-RMG(Cossich, Christina) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by David A Parsiola on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, DELAWARE COUNTY, PRIMOS-SECANE WESTBROOK PARK FIRE COMPANY #5 OF UPPER DARBY PENNSYLVANIA, INC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01977-RMG(Parsiola, David) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, DELAWARE COUNTY, PRIMOS-SECANE WESTBROOK PARK FIRE COMPANY #5 OF UPPER DARBY PENNSYLVANIA, INC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01977-RMG(Cossich, Philip) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, DELAWARE COUNTY, PRIMOS-SECANE WESTBROOK PARK FIRE COMPANY #5 OF UPPER DARBY PENNSYLVANIA, INC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01977-RMG(Taylor, Brandon) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, DELAWARE COUNTY, PRIMOS-SECANE WESTBROOK PARK FIRE COMPANY #5 OF UPPER DARBY PENNSYLVANIA, INC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01977-RMG(Smith, Luana) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#7) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (as of transferred date 7/1/2021) Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:21-cv-02743, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1977-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 18, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 4(Buckeye Project Files), 4.A, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 5.D, 5.E, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D, 10.A, 11.A, 13.A, 18.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 7/15/2021 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02743. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 58) that the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/7/2021.] (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Delaware County. (kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/7/2021.] (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN THE PARTIES HERETO AND THEIR UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL THAT IF THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE IN RE AQUEOUS FILM-FORMING FOAMS PRODUCTS LIABILITY MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION (AFFF MDL), THEN THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SHALL BE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ESTABLISHED RULES AND PROCEDURES IN THE AFFF MDL. SHOULD THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION DECLINE TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE AFFF MDL, DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE THROUGH AND INCLUDING THE 28TH DAY AFTER SUCH DISPOSITION BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/28/21. 6/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/7/2021.] (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15199506), filed by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Certificate of Service)(CHEWNING, KERRI) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/7/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DELAWARE COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Carrier Global Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Raytheon Technologies Corporation is a litigant