Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 08:55:41 (UTC).

Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Easterday et al

Case Summary

On March 31, 2021, Commodity Futures Trading Commission (“Commission” or “CFTC”), represented by Allison Voticky Passman, Ashley J. Burden and Benjamin E. Sedrish, attorneys at U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission, filed a civil enforcement action against Cody Easterday and Easterday Ranches, Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”) seeking injunctive relief, civil monetary penalties, and restitution among other reliefs for allegedly defrauding his business partner. This case was filed in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern District of Washington with Judge Stanley A. Bastian presiding.

In its complaint, CFTC alleged that “For more than 10 years, Defendant Cody Easterday accumulated staggering losses speculatively trading in the cattle futures markets, ultimately amassing more than $200 million in losses in his personal and corporate accounts. To meet margin calls, Easterday concocted a scheme to defraud one of his biggest business partners. Beginning in or before October 1, 2016, and continuing to at least December 1, 2020, (“Relevant Period”), Defendants Easterday Ranches, Inc. (“Easterday Ranches”) and Cody Easterday operated a scheme to defraud a producer of beef and pork products (“Producer”) out of more than $233 million by submitting to the Producer fabricated invoices for reimbursement for cattle that Easterday Ranches had agreed to purchase and care for on behalf of the Producer.”

CFTC further alleged that “In or around November 2020, Cody Easterday admitted to a Producer representative that he had caused Easterday Ranches to submit invoices to the Producer for cattle that never existed, and that he did so to generate money to cover millions of dollars of losses he and Easterday Ranches incurred while engaging in speculative trading in the cattle and corn futures markets. In furtherance of the fraud, in at least 2017 and 2018, Easterday caused Easterday Ranches to submit false cattle inventory, purchase, and sales figures to the Chicago Mercantile Exchange (“CME”) in two hedge exemption applications to seek permission to exceed the exchange’s speculative position limits and avoid disciplinary action.”

 

CFTC further alleged that “Because Easterday Ranches was not entitled to any hedge exemptions as a result of the false information in its hedge exemption applications, Defendants violated CME’s position limits in 2017 and 2018. Easterday also admitted to the fraud and false statements to the CME to the Department of Justice in or about March 2021.”

There are three claims for relief laid down by the CFTC. The first claim is for alleged violations of Section 6(c)(1) of the Act, 7 U.S.C. § 9(1) (2018), and Regulation 180.1(a)(1)–(3), 17 C.F.R. § 180.1(a)(1)–(3) (2020). The second claim is for alleged violations of Section 9(a)(4) of the Act, 7 U.S.C. § 13(a)(4) (2018) False Statements to a Registered Entity. The last claim is for alleged violations of Section 4a(e) of the Act, 7 U.S.C. § 6a(e) (2018) Exceeding CME Position Limits for Live and Feeder Cattle Futures Contracts.

In its prayer for relief, the CFTC has requested the court to adjuge that Defendants have violated the alleged laws, and grant permanent injunction against Defendants prohibiting future violations. CFTC further requested the court to stop Defendants from entering into any transactions involving commodity interests, trading and having any commodity interests, order disgorgement of all obtained gains, order full restitution, and direct Defendants to pay a civil monetary penalty along with costs of this action.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-05050

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A Bastian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commodity Futures Trading Commission

Defendants

Cody Easterday

Easterday Ranches Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allison Voticky Passman

Attorney at U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission

525 West Monroe, Ste 1100

Chicago, IL 60622

Benjamin E Sedrish

Attorney at Commodity Futures Trading Commission

525 W. Monroe St., Ste 1100

Chicago, IL 60661

Ashley J Burden

Attorney at Commodity Futures Trading Commission

525 W Monroe St., Ste. 1100

Chicago, IL 60661

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew M Wagley

Attorney at Etter McMahon Lamberson Van Wert & Oreskovich PC

Bank Of Whitman Bldg, 618 West Riverside, 2Nd Floor

Spokane, WA 99201

Carl Joseph Oreskovich

Attorney at Etter McMahon Lamberson Van Wert & Oreskovich PC

Bank Of Whitman Bldg, 618 West Riverside, 2Nd Floor

Spokane, WA 99201

Thomas A Buford

Attorney at Bush Kornfeld LLP

601 Union Street, Suite 5000

Seattle, WA 98101-2373

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Wagley on behalf of Cody Easterday (Attorney Andrew M Wagley added to party Cody Easterday(pty:dft))(Wagley, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Joseph Oreskovich on behalf of Cody Easterday (Attorney Carl Joseph Oreskovich added to party Cody Easterday(pty:dft))(Oreskovich, Carl) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Easterday Ranches Inc. (Buford, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches Inc (Attorney Thomas A Buford added to party Easterday Ranches Inc(pty:dft))(Buford, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission re Cody Easterday. (Sedrish, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission re Easterday Ranches Inc. (Sedrish, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER: Defendant Cody Easterday's Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint, ECF No. #11 , is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is June 28, 2021. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Cody Easterday. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint)(Oreskovich, Carl) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Wagley on behalf of Cody Easterday (Attorney Andrew M Wagley added to party Cody Easterday(pty:dft))(Wagley, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Joseph Oreskovich on behalf of Cody Easterday (Attorney Carl Joseph Oreskovich added to party Cody Easterday(pty:dft))(Oreskovich, Carl) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is July 30, 2021. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Easterday Ranches Inc. (Buford, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Easterday Ranches Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buford, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches Inc (Attorney Thomas A Buford added to party Easterday Ranches Inc(pty:dft))(Buford, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission re Cody Easterday. (Sedrish, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission re Easterday Ranches Inc. (Sedrish, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Cody Easterday. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Easterday Ranches, Inc.)(LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cody Easterday, Easterday Ranches, Inc. Fee Waived Jury Demand. Filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sedrish, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison V. Passman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley John Burden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin E Sedrish