This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:39:01 (UTC).

COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES v. BARR et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES filed an Other lawsuit against BARR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03557

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

Defendants

WILBUR L. ROSS, JR.

Washington, DC 20230

WILLIAM P. BARR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas N. Letter

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

David A. O'Neil

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

801 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Ste 500

Washington, DC 20004

Laura Emily O'Neill

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Josephine T. Morse

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Nathaniel D. Johnson

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

801 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20004

Anna A. Moody

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

801 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant Attorneys

James J. Gilligan

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw, Room 11200

Washington, DC 20005

James Mahoney Burnham

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Elizabeth J. Shapiro

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Steven A. Myers

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Gary Daniel Feldon

Attorney at UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw, Room 11104

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of All Defendants (Burnham, James) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

25 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#25

(#25) Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by WILLIAM P. BARR, WILBUR L. ROSS, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#24

(#24) Memorandum in opposition to re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment) MOTION to Dismiss / Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

19 #6

Exhibit (Foti Exhibits AA-FF)

19 #4

Exhibit (Foti Exhibits H-P)

19 #3

Exhibit (Foti Exhibits A-G)

19 #2

Affidavit (Declaration of Anthony Foti)

19 #1

Affidavit (Declaration of Elliott Davis)

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibits JJJ-ZZZ

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit III-Pt 2

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit III-Pt 1

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibits AAA-HHH

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibits AA-ZZ

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit N-Z

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit M

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibits J-L

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A-I

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of All Defendants (Burnham, James) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' consent motion for leave to file excess pages #25 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants may file a reply of up to 45 pages. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/23/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by WILLIAM P. BARR, WILBUR L. ROSS, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Memorandum in opposition to re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment) MOTION to Dismiss / Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) REPLY to opposition to motion re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment / Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel D. Johnson on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Johnson, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages #21 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file a combined reply and response of up to 60 pages. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/21/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' motion for extension of time nunc pro tunc #20 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/16/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment and to File Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, Nunc Pro Tunc by WILLIAM P. BARR, WILBUR L. ROSS, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report #7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on December 13, 2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/12/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by WILLIAM P. BARR, WILBUR L. ROSS, JR. (Myers, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for the plaintiffs shall confer with counsel for the defendants and that the parties shall file, on or before December 11, 2019, a joint status report with a proposed schedule for an initial scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/6/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILBUR L. ROSS, JR served on 12/2/2019 (Moody, Anna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/2/19. (Moody, Anna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/27/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, WILBUR L. ROSS, JR. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, WILBUR L. ROSS, JR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6594605) filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I, #2 Exhibit Exhibits J-L, #3 Exhibit Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit Exhibit N-Z, #5 Exhibit Exhibits AA-ZZ, #6 Exhibit Exhibits AAA-HHH, #7 Exhibit Exhibit III-Pt 1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit III-Pt 2, #9 Exhibit Exhibits JJJ-ZZZ, #10 Exhibit Exhibits AAAA-ZZZZ, #11 Exhibit Exhibits AAAAA-HHHHH, #12 Summons to William P. Barr, #13 Summons to Wilbur Ross, Jr., #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anna Augusta Moody

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel David Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Josephine Morse Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Neal Letter Esq.