This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 08:22:30 (UTC).

Commercial Funding Inc. v. Odom Transport Company Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Commercial Funding Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Odom Transport Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commercial Funding Inc.

Defendants

Steven Barry Odom

Deborah C. Odom

Odom Transport Company Inc.

Odom Trucking Company, Inc.

Steve Odom

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Elaine Fowler Thompson

Attorney at Commercial Credit Group Inc.

227 West Trade St Ste 1450

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Odom Transport Company, Inc., Odom Trucking Company, Inc., Deborah C. Odom, and Steve Odom. (maf) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT Servicemembers Civil Relief Act by Commercial Funding Inc. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Plaintiff's Claim

#11

(#11) MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Plaintiff's Claim)(Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default

#9

(#9) MOTION for Entry of Default by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default)(Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice of Withdrawal of document by Commercial Funding Inc. ***Documents terminated: #6 Affidavit filed by Commercial Funding Inc., #5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Odom Transport Company, Inc., Odom Trucking Company, Inc., Deborah C. Odom, and Steve Odom filed by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) **Withdrawn per #8 Notice** AFFIDAVIT Servicemembers Civil Relief Act by Commercial Funding Inc. (Thompson, Laura) Modified docket text on 1/15/2020. (maf) Modified docket text on 1/21/2020. (maf) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

5 #2

Affidavit of Plaintiff's Claim

5 #1

Exhibit SCRA Aff

#5

(#5) **Withdrawn per #8 Notice** MOTION for Default Judgment as to Odom Transport Company, Inc., Odom Trucking Company, Inc., Deborah C. Odom, and Steve Odom by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCRA Aff, #2 Affidavit of Plaintiff's Claim)(Thompson, Laura) Modified docket text on 1/21/2020. (maf) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Commercial Funding Inc. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commercial Funding Inc. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Deborah C. Odom, Steven Barry Odom, Odom Transport Company Inc., Odom Trucking Company, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT Servicemembers Civil Relief Act by Commercial Funding Inc. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#12) ***Document Deleted. Corrected PDF filed at No. #14 . (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Plaintiff's Claim)(Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Odom Transport Company, Inc., Odom Trucking Company, Inc., Deborah C. Odom, and Steve Odom. (maf) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Entry of Default by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default)(Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Withdrawal of document by Commercial Funding Inc. ***Documents terminated: #6 Affidavit filed by Commercial Funding Inc., #5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Odom Transport Company, Inc., Odom Trucking Company, Inc., Deborah C. Odom, and Steve Odom filed by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***Document Deleted. Duplicate filing as No. #6 . (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **Withdrawn per #8 Notice** AFFIDAVIT Servicemembers Civil Relief Act by Commercial Funding Inc. (Thompson, Laura) Modified docket text on 1/15/2020. (maf) Modified docket text on 1/21/2020. (maf) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **Withdrawn per #8 Notice** MOTION for Default Judgment as to Odom Transport Company, Inc., Odom Trucking Company, Inc., Deborah C. Odom, and Steve Odom by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCRA Aff, #2 Affidavit of Plaintiff's Claim)(Thompson, Laura) Modified docket text on 1/21/2020. (maf) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Answer deadlines per #4 Affidavit: Deborah C. Odom answer due 12/30/2019; Steven Barry Odom answer due 1/3/2020; Odom Transport Company Inc. answer due 12/30/2019; Odom Trucking Company, Inc. answer due 12/30/2019. (maf) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Commercial Funding Inc. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commercial Funding Inc. (Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Deborah C. Odom, Steven Barry Odom, Odom Transport Company Inc., Odom Trucking Company, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carlton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division. Case has been copied from 3:19-cv-659 to 1:19-cv-336. Please use 1:19-cv-336 for all future pleadings. (ctb) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Commercial Funding Inc. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4283266), filed by Commercial Funding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit Financing Statement, #3 Exhibit Corporate Guaranty, #4 Exhibit Personal Guarantee - Deborah, #5 Exhibit Personal Guarantee - Steve, #6 Exhibit First Addendum, #7 Exhibit Second Addemdum)(Thompson, Laura) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less