This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 12:23:32 (UTC).

Commerce West Insurance Company v. Cisneros et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Commerce West Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cisneros. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary Alice Theiler and Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00109

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mary Alice Theiler

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commerce West Insurance Company

Defendants

Ignacio Cisneros

Estate of Alla Chikh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tyler J Roth

Attorney at COLE WATHEN LEID HALL PC

1505 Westlake Ave N Ste 700

Seattle, WA 98109

Rory W Leid, III

Attorney at COLE WATHEN LEID HALL PC

1505 Westlake Ave N Ste 700

Seattle, WA 98109

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Tyler J Roth for Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company from 03/04/2020 - 03/13/2020. (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19.proceedings. (KMP) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

12 #5

Exhibit E

12 #4

Exhibit D

12 #3

Exhibit C

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Tyler J. Roth filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company re #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2020, (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF COMMERCE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY'S #7 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RE: DEFENDANT IGNACIO CISNEROS signed by Clerk William M McCool.(TF) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of Non-Military Status & DOD Status Attached filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company re #7 MOTION for Default re Defendant Ignacio Cisneros (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) DECLARATION of Tyler J. Roth filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company re #7 MOTION for Default re Defendant Ignacio Cisneros (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Default re Defendant Ignacio Cisneros, filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/21/2020, (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Ulyana Johnston mailed on 1/24/2020 (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ignacio Cisneros on 1/30/2020, filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Tyler J Roth for Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company from 03/04/2020 - 03/13/2020. (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19.proceedings. (KMP) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Tyler J. Roth filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company re #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2020, (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF COMMERCE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY'S #7 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RE: DEFENDANT IGNACIO CISNEROS signed by Clerk William M McCool.(TF) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Non-Military Status & DOD Status Attached filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company re #7 MOTION for Default re Defendant Ignacio Cisneros (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Tyler J. Roth filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company re #7 MOTION for Default re Defendant Ignacio Cisneros (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Default re Defendant Ignacio Cisneros, filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/21/2020, (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Ulyana Johnston mailed on 1/24/2020 (Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ignacio Cisneros on 1/30/2020, filed by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MAPFRE S.A., Other Affiliate ACIC Holding Co., Inc., Other Affiliate MAPFRE U.S.A. Corp., Other Affiliate MAPFRE Internacional S.A. for Commerce West Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Commerce West Insurance Company (Leid, Rory) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Commerce West Insurance Company (Leid, Rory) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Ignacio Cisneros and Estate of Alla Chikh. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Commerce West Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/31/2020. (GT) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketHon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) Ignacio Cisneros, Estate of Alla Chikh (Receipt # 0981-6096607) Attorney Tyler J Roth added to party Commerce West Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Commerce West Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cisneros, #2 Summons Estate of Alla Chikh, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roth, Tyler) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Commerce West Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rory W Leid, III