This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 08:50:53 (UTC).

COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. INTERSTATE NDT, INC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 COMMERCE INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INTERSTATE NDT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01363

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendant

INTERSTATE NDT, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kasandra N. Rogiers

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #10

Exhibit I

#2

#4

(#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. (bjl) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. INTERSTATE NDT, INC waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Rogiers, Kasandra) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. INTERSTATE NDT, INC waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Rogiers, Kasandra) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. (bjl) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available #Here Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/14/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF docum ent will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to INTERSTATE NDT, INC (jv) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against INTERSTATE NDT, INC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6750653), filed by COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (jv) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less