This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:56:53 (UTC).

Commerce and Industry Insurance Company v. Rhode Island Airport Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Commerce and Industry Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rhode Island Airport Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John J. McConnell, Jr. and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00466

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commerce and Industry Insurance Company

Defendants

Rhode Island Airport Corporation

Daniel D Traficante

Sharon M Traficante

Carolyn Scire

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew R. McConville

Andrew T Houghton

Bryan M. Abramoske

Karen Schnur

Defendant Attorneys

Brooks R. Magratten

Michael J. Daly

Nicole M. Matteo

Jeffrey A. Mega

Mark B. Decof

Timothy J. Grimes

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante. Responses due by 2/3/2022. (Mega, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#23

(#23) MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Rhode Island Airport Corporation. Responses due by 2/2/2022. (Magratten, Brooks) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#22

(#22) Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante. Responses due by 12/29/2021. (Mega, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B. Decof on behalf of Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante (Decof, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Grimes on behalf of Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante (Grimes, Timothy) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Mega on behalf of Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante (Mega, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Carolyn Scire. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTEXT ORDER granting #24 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer; Carolyn Scire answer due 2/28/2022; Daniel D Traficante answer due 2/28/2022; Sharon M Traficante answer due 2/28/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/21/2022. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

DocketReset Deadlines: Rhode Island Airport Corporation answer due 2/28/2022. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTEXT ORDER granting #23 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/21/2022. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante. Responses due by 2/3/2022. (Mega, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Rhode Island Airport Corporation. Responses due by 2/2/2022. (Magratten, Brooks) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketTEXT ORDER granting #22 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer; Carolyn Scire answer due 2/8/2022; Daniel D Traficante answer due 2/8/2022; Sharon M Traficante answer due 2/8/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/16/2021. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante. Responses due by 12/29/2021. (Mega, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B. Decof on behalf of Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante (Decof, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Grimes on behalf of Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante (Grimes, Timothy) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Mega on behalf of Carolyn Scire, Daniel D Traficante, Sharon M Traficante (Mega, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
11/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Carolyn Scire. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Sharon M Traficante. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Daniel D Traficante. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Rhode Island Airport Corporation. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Commerce and Industry Insurance Company.. (McConville, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690481 ), filed by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Policy, #2 Exhibit Underlying Plaintiffs' 2nd Amended Complaints, #3 Exhibit Judgment in Underlying Actions, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 RIAC Summons, #6 Daniel D. Traficante Summons, #7 Sharon M. Traficante Summons, #8 Carolyn Scire Summons)(McConville, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Commerce and Industry Insurance Company.. (McConville, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690481 ), filed by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Policy, #2 Exhibit Underlying Plaintiffs' 2nd Amended Complaints, #3 Exhibit Judgment in Underlying Actions, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 RIAC Summons, #6 Daniel D. Traficante Summons, #7 Sharon M. Traficante Summons, #8 Carolyn Scire Summons)(McConville, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less