This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2020 at 10:15:20 (UTC).

Comfort et al v. Exmark Manufacturing Company Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Comfort filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Exmark Manufacturing Company Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00890

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carl Comfort

Rita Comfort

Defendants

The Toro Company

EXMARK Manufacturing Company Incorporated

John Doe 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian S Birk

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Jeff Nicholas Comstock

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Defendant Attorney

Stanley Jay Terry

Attorney at CARNEY BADLEY SPELLMAN PS

701 Fifth Ave, Ste 3600

Seattle, WA 98104-7010

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Complaint Summons & Complaint

1 #2

Process Svc. Transmittals

1 #3

KCSC NOA

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/6/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/13/2020, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint; by THE TORO COMPANY and by EXMARK Manufacturing Company Incorporated.(Terry, Stanley) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/19/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketJudge J Richard Creatura added. (SG) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Carl Comfort, Rita Comfort (Comstock, Jeff) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent EXMARK Manufacturing Company Incorporated for The Toro Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Toro Company (Terry, Stanley) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-08929-0; (Receipt # BWAWDC-6390650), filed by EXMARK Manufacturing Company Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Process Svc. Transmittals, #3 KCSC NOA, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Terry, Stanley) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/11/2020) attached State complaint as separate document(SG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #5 State Summons) (SG). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Exmark Manufacturing Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where THE TORO COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian S Birk

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeff Nicholas Comstock