This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 07:16:01 (UTC).

Comerica Bank v. Monster, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Comerica Bank filed an Other lawsuit against Monster, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06590

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Comerica Bank

Defendants

Does 1-10

Canon Financial Services, Inc.

Monster, Inc.

Nisos Group LLC

NL Finance co., LLC

North American Production Sharing, Inc.

NPD Group, Inc.

AIT Worldwide Logistics Inc.

Robert O'Brien

Amy Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Douglas Moran

Attorney at Carlson Dash, LLC

216 S. Jefferson Street, Suite 504

Chicago, IL 60661

Justin Kyle Malenius

Attorney at Carlson Dash, Llc

216 S. Jefferson Street, Suite 504

Chicago, IL 60661

Kurt M. Carlson

Attorney at Carlson Dash LLC

216 S. Jefferson St., Suite 504

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 7

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant NL Finance co., LLC. (cm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 1/7/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AIT Worldwide Logistics Inc., Canon Financial Services, Inc., Monster, Inc., NL Finance co., LLC, NPD Group, Inc., Nisos Group LLC, North American Production Sharing, Inc. (kl, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Comerica Bank by Justin Kyle Malenius (Malenius, Justin) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Comerica Bank by C. Douglas Moran (Moran, C. Douglas) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Comerica Bank by Kurt M. Carlson (Carlson, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carlson, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Interpleader And Declaratory Relief filed by Comerica Bank; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17615718. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 7)(Carlson, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The NPD Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MONSTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant