This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 10:12:24 (UTC).

Comer v. Lehrer et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Comer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lehrer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00334

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Bolt Comer

Defendants

Moshe Lehrer

Avraham Lehrer

Rosa Lehrer

Max Lehrer

KMI Group, Inc.

Joe Levin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian M. Rostocki

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1201 Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Nicholas R. Rodriguez

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Avraham Lehrer.(apk) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Pennsylvania State Police Commissioner by Nicole Bolt Comer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eckard, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against KMI Group, Inc., Avraham Lehrer, Moshe Lehrer, Rosa Lehrer - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3563539.) - filed by Nicole Bolt Comer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #9 re-docketed to reflect correct event code. (apk) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Avraham Lehrer.(apk) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Pennsylvania State Police Commissioner by Nicole Bolt Comer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eckard, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nicole Bolt Comer: For KMI Group, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Eckard, Mark) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nicole Bolt Comer: For Rosa Lehrer waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Eckard, Mark) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nicole Bolt Comer: For Moshe Lehrer waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Eckard, Mark) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Bolt Comer. Avraham Lehrer served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Eckard, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against KMI Group, Inc., Avraham Lehrer, Moshe Lehrer, Rosa Lehrer - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3563539.) - filed by Nicole Bolt Comer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian M. Rostocki(Designation Retained)