This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 08:46:55 (UTC).

Comer et al v. Viking Client Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Comer filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Viking Client Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Davis and Elizabeth Cowan Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01528

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Davis

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anjanette Comer

Christopher D. Evans

Defendant

Viking Client Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J Lyons, Jr

Attorney at Consumer Justice Center P.A.

367 Commerce Court

Vadnais Heights, MN 55127

Jesse S. Johnson

Attorney at Greenwald Davidson Radbil PLLC

7601 N. Federal Hwy., Suite A-230

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

Alexander M Baggio

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

333 South Seventh Street, Suite 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Viking Client Services, LLC response due 9/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/4/2021.(TMA) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Viking Client Services, LLC. (Baggio, Alexander) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Baggio, Alexander) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer by Viking Client Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Anjanette Comer and Christopher D. Evans. (Baggio, Alexander) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anjanette Comer, Christopher D. Evans. Viking Client Services, LLC served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jesse Johnson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8862095 filed by Anjanette Comer, Christopher D. Evans. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#5

(#5) FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jesse Johnson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8856841 filed by Anjanette Comer, Christopher D. Evans. (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 7/2/2021 (JGK). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Viking Client Services, LLC. (MMP) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) with Jury Trial Demanded against Viking Client Services, LLC(filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8855741) filed by Anjanette Comer, Christopher D. Evans. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (MMP). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Viking Client Services, LLC response due 9/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/4/2021.(TMA) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Viking Client Services, LLC. (Baggio, Alexander) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Baggio, Alexander) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer by Viking Client Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Anjanette Comer and Christopher D. Evans. (Baggio, Alexander) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anjanette Comer, Christopher D. Evans. Viking Client Services, LLC served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jesse S. Johnson for Anjanette Comer and for Christopher D. Evans. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/9/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jesse Johnson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8862095 filed by Anjanette Comer, Christopher D. Evans. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jesse Johnson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8856841 filed by Anjanette Comer, Christopher D. Evans. (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 7/2/2021 (JGK). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jesse S. Johnson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Viking Client Services, LLC. (MMP) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1528 (MJD/ECW). (MMP) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) with Jury Trial Demanded against Viking Client Services, LLC(filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8855741) filed by Anjanette Comer, Christopher D. Evans. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (MMP). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Viking Client Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander M Baggio