This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2021 at 12:07:58 (UTC).

Combs v. American Modern Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Combs filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Modern Select Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00671

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lanora Combs

Defendant

American Modern Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Collin Day Hatcher

Attorney at King, Yaklin & Wilkins, LLP

Suite 125, 192 Anderson Street

Marietta, GA 30060

Matthew Michael Wilkins

Attorney at King Yaklin & Wilkins, LLP

192 Anderson Street, Suite 125

Marietta, GA 30060

Defendant Attorneys

Kori Elizabeth Eskridge

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

Thomas Daryl Martin

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers

1355 Peachtree Street, N.E., The Peachtree, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30309-3238

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Modern Select Insurance Company.(Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by American Modern Select Insurance Company of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Upon Non-Parties (Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/19/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Persons by Lanora Combs. (Hatcher, Collin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#11

(#11) Initial Disclosures by Lanora Combs.(Hatcher, Collin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#10

(#10) Initial Disclosures by American Modern Select Insurance Company.(Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#9

(#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Lanora Combs. (Hatcher, Collin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Modern Select Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Midland-Guardian Co., Other Affiliate The Midland Company, Other Affiliate Munich American Holding Corp., Other Affiliate American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Munchener Ruckversicherungs-Gesellcshaft Aktiengesellschaft for American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#7

(#7) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#6

(#6) Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 3-7, July 1-5, August 31 - September 12, October 25-27, November 24-26, December 20-31, 2021, by Kori Elizabeth Eskridge. (Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Modern Select Insurance Company.(Martin, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/17/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#3

(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Modern Select Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 7/16/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit -Removal Certificate

1 #1

Exhibit -A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10726023) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -Removal Certificate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Modern Select Insurance Company.(Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by American Modern Select Insurance Company of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Upon Non-Parties (Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/19/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Persons by Lanora Combs. (Hatcher, Collin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Initial Disclosures by Lanora Combs.(Hatcher, Collin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Disclosures by American Modern Select Insurance Company.(Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Lanora Combs. (Hatcher, Collin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Modern Select Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Midland-Guardian Co., Other Affiliate The Midland Company, Other Affiliate Munich American Holding Corp., Other Affiliate American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Munchener Ruckversicherungs-Gesellcshaft Aktiengesellschaft for American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 3-7, July 1-5, August 31 - September 12, October 25-27, November 24-26, December 20-31, 2021, by Kori Elizabeth Eskridge. (Eskridge, Kori) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Modern Select Insurance Company.(Martin, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/17/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Modern Select Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 7/16/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10726023) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -Removal Certificate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kori Elizabeth Eskridge

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Daryl Martin(Designation Retained)