This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2020 at 08:51:01 (UTC).

Columbus Life Insurance Company v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Columbus Life Insurance Company filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Columbus Life Insurance Company

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tracy L. Eggleston

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

301 S. College St., Suite 2100, One Wells Fargo Center

Charlotte, NC 28202-6037

Defendant Attorneys

A. Lee Hogewood, III

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

4350 Lassiter At North Hills Avenue, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27609

Zachary Scott Buckheit

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

P.O. Box 17047

Raleigh, NC 27619-7047

Matthew Thomas Houston

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

4350 Lassiter At North Hills Avenue, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27609

 

Court Documents

11 #4

Exhibit 3 - Legislative History for H.B. 1489, 2007 Gen. Assemb., Reg. Sess. (N.

11 #3

Exhibit 2 - June 2, 2020 Letter from Columbus with Policy Information

11 #2

Exhibit 1 - Life Insurance Application

11 #1

Index of Exhibits

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Columbus Life Insurance Policy

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 Memorandum in Support. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #10 and #11 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.) Modified on 7/2/2020 (Waddell, K.). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Life Insurance Application, #3 Exhibit 2 - June 2, 2020 Letter from Columbus with Policy Information, #4 Exhibit 3 - Legislative History for H.B. 1489, 2007 Gen. Assemb., Reg. Sess. (N.C. 2007)) (Hogewood, A.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Hogewood, A.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Notice of Appearance, #8 Notice of Appearance, #9 Financial Disclosure Statement. In future filings, the case number should read as 4:20-CV-73-M. No action by counsel required. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent WFC Holdings, LLC for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Buckheit, Zachary) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Zachary Scott Buckheit on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Buckheit, Zachary) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Thomas Houston on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Houston, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by A. Lee Hogewood, III on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Hogewood, A.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020. (Eggleston, Tracy) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wells Fargo Bank, NA on 5/5/2020 by Columbus Life Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 6/8/2020. (Eggleston, Tracy) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Columbus Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc. for Columbus Life Insurance Company. (Eggleston, Tracy) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Tracy L. Eggleston on behalf of Columbus Life Insurance Company. (Eggleston, Tracy) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5413236.), filed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Columbus Life Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Eggleston, Tracy) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMBUS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracy Lynn Eggleston