This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:34:22 (UTC).

Columbia v. James River Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Columbia filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against James River Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eileen S Willett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eileen S Willett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Candice Columbia

Defendant

James River Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin James Chapman

Attorney at Rowley Chapman & Barney Limited

63 E Main St., Ste. 501

Mesa, AZ 85234

Defendant Attorneys

Adam B Campbell

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & OMeara - Tempe, AZ

8950 S 52Nd St., Ste. 201

Tempe, AZ 85284

Emily Christine Cunion

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & OMeara - Tempe, AZ

8950 S 52Nd St., Ste. 201

Tempe, AZ 85284

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) First MOTION Consider Filing Timely by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Campbell, Adam) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#17

(#17) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report filed by Plaintiff Candice Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order)(Chapman, Kevin) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order

#18

(#18) STIPULATION to Stay Proceeding by James River Insurance Company. (Campbell, Adam) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant's "Motion to Consider Notice of Removal Timely Filed on January 3, 2020" (Doc. #5 ). Defendant's Notice of Removal is deemed timely filed on January 3, 2020. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/28/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. (See document for further details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/23/2020. (WLP) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) JRIC ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James River Insurance Company.(Campbell, Adam) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17795691. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-24-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (ARC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#20

(#20) JOINT RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED vacating Case Management Conference set for February 27, 2020. Discovery due by 11/27/2020. Dispositive motions due by 1/29/2021.(See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/20/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER - The Court has considered Stipulation to Stay Proceeding (Doc. #18 ). The Stipulation to Stay the case is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/20/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#13

(#13) * NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Candice Columbia. (Chapman, Kevin) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 1/28/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Campbell, Adam) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by James River Insurance Company. (Campbell, Adam) (ARC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED vacating Case Management Conference set for February 27, 2020. Discovery due by 11/27/2020. Dispositive motions due by 1/29/2021.(See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/20/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER - The Court has considered Stipulation to Stay Proceeding (Doc. #18 ). The Stipulation to Stay the case is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/20/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION to Stay Proceeding by James River Insurance Company. (Campbell, Adam) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report filed by Plaintiff Candice Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order)(Chapman, Kevin) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Campbell, Adam) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant's "Motion to Consider Notice of Removal Timely Filed on January 3, 2020" (Doc. #5 ). Defendant's Notice of Removal is deemed timely filed on January 3, 2020. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/28/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Candice Columbia. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Please note for future filings. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) * NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Candice Columbia. (Chapman, Kevin) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 1/28/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. (See document for further details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/23/2020. (WLP) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#11) Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • Docket(#10) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#8) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JRIC ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James River Insurance Company.(Campbell, Adam) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION Consider Filing Timely by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Campbell, Adam) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17795691. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-24-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (ARC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by James River Insurance Company. (Campbell, Adam) (ARC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-097480. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17795691 filed by James River Insurance Company. (Campbell, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(ARC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.