This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/06/2022 at 07:37:27 (UTC).

Columbia Riverkeeper v. Weyerhaeuser NR Company

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Columbia Riverkeeper filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Weyerhaeuser NR Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David G. Estudillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-05132

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David G. Estudillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Columbia Riverkeeper

Defendant

Weyerhaeuser NR Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Alan Knutsen

Jessica Susan Durney

Simone Anter

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Weyerhaeuser NR Company. (SP) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/25/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/1/2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Weyerhaeuser NR Company mailed on 3/9/2022 (Hobbs, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Weyerhaeuser Company, Corporate Parent Weyerhaeuser Timber Holdings, Inc. for Weyerhaeuser NR Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weyerhaeuser NR Company (Hobbs, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Service of Pre-Suit Notice Letter and Complaint Under Clean Water Act Requirements by Plaintiff Columbia Riverkeeper (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Service of Pre-Suit Notice Letter and Complaint Under Clean Water Act Requirements by Plaintiff Columbia Riverkeeper (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Weyerhaeuser Company, Corporate Parent Weyerhaeuser Timber Holdings, Inc. for Weyerhaeuser NR Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weyerhaeuser NR Company (Hobbs, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Weyerhaeuser NR Company mailed on 3/9/2022 (Hobbs, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/25/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/1/2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Weyerhaeuser NR Company. (SP) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketU.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo added. (SP) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Weyerhaeuser NR Company (Receipt # AWAWDC-7464529), filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less