This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2022 at 08:53:11 (UTC).

Columbia Riverkeeper v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 Columbia Riverkeeper filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against United States Army Corps of Engineers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A Bastian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-05152

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A Bastian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Columbia Riverkeeper

Defendants

United States Army Corps of Engineers

Lieutenant General Scott A Spellmon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Alan Knutsen

Miles Johnson

Emma Bruden

Defendant Attorneys

Mark A Nitczynski

Jeffrey T Hammons

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #11 JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; granting #12 parties Joint Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

10 #5

Complaint and Docket Sheet for District of Oregon

10 #4

Complaint and Docket Sheet for Eastern District of Washington

10 #3

Proof of Service

10 #2

Schedule of Actions

10 #1

Brief in Support of Motion

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Hammons on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jeffrey T Hammons added to party Scott A Spellmon(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey T Hammons added to party United States Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft))(Hammons, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#8

(#8) DECLARATION of of Service of Pre-Suit Notice Letter and Complaint Under Clean Water Act Requirements by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Nitczynski on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Mark A Nitczynski added to party Scott A Spellmon(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A Nitczynski added to party United States Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft))(Nitczynski, Mark) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE by Columbia Riverkeeper re Scott A Spellmon. (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE by Columbia Riverkeeper re United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Bruden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Emma Bruden added to party Columbia Riverkeeper(pty:pla))(Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #11 JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; granting #12 parties Joint Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammons, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammons, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Columbia Riverkeeper. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Complaint and Docket Sheet for Eastern District of Washington, #5 Complaint and Docket Sheet for District of Oregon)(Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Hammons on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jeffrey T Hammons added to party Scott A Spellmon(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey T Hammons added to party United States Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft))(Hammons, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) DECLARATION of of Service of Pre-Suit Notice Letter and Complaint Under Clean Water Act Requirements by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Nitczynski on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Mark A Nitczynski added to party Scott A Spellmon(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A Nitczynski added to party United States Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft))(Nitczynski, Mark) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE by Columbia Riverkeeper re Scott A Spellmon. (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE by Columbia Riverkeeper re United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Bruden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Emma Bruden added to party Columbia Riverkeeper(pty:pla))(Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Lieutenant General Scott A Spellmon)(LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021

DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Scott A. Spellmon, United States Army Corps of Engineers ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3934911) Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons for U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, #3 Summons Proposed Summons for Lieutenant General Scott A. Spellmon)(Knutsen, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less