This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2020 at 08:37:18 (UTC).

Columbia Riverkeeper v. Port of Longview

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Columbia Riverkeeper filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Port of Longview. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Benjamin H. Settle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05981

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin H. Settle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Columbia Riverkeeper

Defendant

Port of Longview

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Zemel

Simone Anter

Defendant Attorneys

Kent Michael Fandel

Douglas S Morrison

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas S Morrison on behalf of Defendant Port of Longview. (Morrison, Douglas) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Port of Longview mailed on 10/7/2020 (Zemel, Marc) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/24/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper (Zemel, Marc) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Port of Longview (MET) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020

DocketJudge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MET) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Port of Longview (Receipt # AWAWDC-6639166) Attorney Marc Zemel added to party Columbia Riverkeeper(pty:pla), filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Zemel, Marc) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less