This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2020 at 09:17:25 (UTC).

Columbia Riverkeeper v. Kalama Export Company LLC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Columbia Riverkeeper filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Kalama Export Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Benjamin H. Settle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05938

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin H. Settle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Columbia Riverkeeper

Defendant

Kalama Export Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Adam Smith

Alyssa Lee Englebrecht

Simone Anter

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

10/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Kalama Export Company LLC mailed on 9/21/2020 (Englebrecht, Alyssa) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Kalama Export Company LLC. (ERA) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2020

DocketJudge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper (Englebrecht, Alyssa) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kalama Export Company, LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-6610852), filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Englebrecht, Alyssa) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less