This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 10:00:05 (UTC).

COLSTEN v. MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 COLSTEN filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03104

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA L. STARKE COLSTEN

Defendant

MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron J. Williamson

Attorney at WILLIAMSON CIVIL LAW, LLC

8888 Keystone Crossing, Suite 1300

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Defendant Attorneys

David L. Swider

Attorney at BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS, LLP (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Philip R. Zimmerly

Attorney at BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS, LLP (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines: Settlement Conference set for 5/19/2021 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. On or before three business days before the conference, the parties shall submit (not file) a confidential settlement statement. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/13/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/27/2021 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/13/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/11/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2021. Discovery due by 10/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/8/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#11

(#11) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on January 7, 2021, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT.(Zimmerly, Philip) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#8

(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT . (Zimmerly, Philip) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/3/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#6

(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Zimmerly on behalf of Defendant MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT. (Zimmerly, Philip) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE Regarding Pending Motions, filed by Defendant MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT (Swider, David) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Swider on behalf of Defendant MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT. (Swider, David) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Complaint

1 #1

State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Appearance, Motion for Enla

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware Circuit Court, case number 18C03-2011-CT-000120, filed by MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6300814) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time), #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swider, David) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines: Settlement Conference set for 5/19/2021 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. On or before three business days before the conference, the parties shall submit (not file) a confidential settlement statement. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/13/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/27/2021 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/13/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/11/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2021. Discovery due by 10/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/8/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on January 7, 2021, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT.(Zimmerly, Philip) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT . (Zimmerly, Philip) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/3/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Zimmerly on behalf of Defendant MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT. (Zimmerly, Philip) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Regarding Pending Motions, filed by Defendant MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT (Swider, David) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Swider on behalf of Defendant MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT. (Swider, David) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware Circuit Court, case number 18C03-2011-CT-000120, filed by MUNCIE SANITARY DISTRICT. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6300814) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time), #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swider, David) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less