This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 08:14:43 (UTC).

M.B. v. Colortone, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 M B filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Colortone, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and John E. McDermott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05736

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M. B.

Defendants and Petitioners

Colortone, Inc.

AMAZON.COM, INC

MB

Amazon.com, Inc.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haik Beloryan

Attorney at Beloryan and Manukyan LLP

4730 Woodman Avenue Suite 405

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Julie LeMaye Hussey

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 921330

Elliott J. Joh

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

505 Howard Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Amazon.com, Inc. is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. It shall file its response by no later than 7/28/2021. Plaintiff may file a reply by no later than 8/4/2021. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#14

(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Spring Street Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Spring Street Courthouse. (gk) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO REMAND by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #12 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case Number 21STCV16243, and Plaintiff will thereafter stipulate to stay all claims against Amazon.com, Inc. pending the State Court's approval of her settlement with Colortone. Once the State Court approves her settlement with Colortone, Plaintiff shall dismiss all claims against Amazon.com, Inc. with prejudice. Plaintiff is bound to seek no more than $75,000 in total, exclusive of interest and costs in this litigation from either or all defendants. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs with respect to removal and subsequent remand of the action. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#12

(#12) Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Colortone, Inc..(Attorney Elliott J. Joh added to party Colortone, Inc.(pty:dft))(Joh, Elliott) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/20/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Joh, Elliott) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#7

(#7) Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., identifying Amazon.Com, Inc.'s. (Hussey, Julie) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Hussey, Julie) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. Attachment 2 Certificate of Interested Persons should be e-filed separately under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Certificate of Interested Persons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Spring Street Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Spring Street Courthouse. (gk) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO REMAND by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #12 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case Number 21STCV16243, and Plaintiff will thereafter stipulate to stay all claims against Amazon.com, Inc. pending the State Court's approval of her settlement with Colortone. Once the State Court approves her settlement with Colortone, Plaintiff shall dismiss all claims against Amazon.com, Inc. with prejudice. Plaintiff is bound to seek no more than $75,000 in total, exclusive of interest and costs in this litigation from either or all defendants. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs with respect to removal and subsequent remand of the action. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Colortone, Inc..(Attorney Elliott J. Joh added to party Colortone, Inc.(pty:dft))(Joh, Elliott) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/20/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Joh, Elliott) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Amazon.com, Inc. is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. It shall file its response by no later than 7/28/2021. Plaintiff may file a reply by no later than 8/4/2021. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., identifying Amazon.Com, Inc.'s. (Hussey, Julie) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Hussey, Julie) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. Attachment 2 Certificate of Interested Persons should be e-filed separately under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Colortone, Inc., Does 1 to 50, Inclusive, filed by Plaintiff M. B.. Filed in State Court on 4/29/2021 Submitted with Exhibit A pg 7 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Central District, case number 21STCV16243 Receipt No: ACACDC-31637295 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, #3 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Julie LeMaye Hussey added to party AMAZON.COM, INC(pty:bkmov))(Hussey, Julie) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant