This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 07:07:17 (UTC).

Colorado v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Colorado filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey S. White and Robert M. Illman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06218

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jeffrey S. White

Robert M. Illman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George S Colorado

Defendant

Commissioner Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katherine Rose Siegfried

Attorney at Law Office of Katherine Siegfried

1939 Harrison Street, Suite 120

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

Lynn Harada

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/18/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Randomly Assigned Magistrate Judge For All Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/18/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/18/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Randomly Assigned Magistrate Judge For All Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/18/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Harada, Lynn) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #1 Complaint, #5 Social Security Procedural Order and #6 Order Granting IFP Sent to U.S. Attorney's Office. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Andrew Saul, Commission of Social Security on 09/04/2020 by George S Colorado. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by George S Colorado.. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by George S Colorado. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byGeorge S Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less