This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2019 at 07:43:29 (UTC).

Colony Insurance Company v. The Khalsa Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Colony Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Khalsa Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04514

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colony Insurance Company

Defendants

Luboslav Hvizda

The Khalsa Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Wade Savrin

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP -Atl

Suite 1600, 100 Galleria Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

Defendant Attorneys

Maxwell Kent Thelen

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

1226 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306

Scott Dewitt Delius

Attorney at Delius Law Firm, P.C.

Suite C-290, 2020 Howell Mill Road

Atlanta, GA 30318

James Darren Summerville

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

1226 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Return of Service Executed by Colony Insurance Company. The Khalsa Group, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Savrin, Philip) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by James Darren Summerville on behalf of Luboslav Hvizda (Summerville, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell Kent Thelen on behalf of Luboslav Hvizda (Thelen, Maxwell) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Luboslav Hvizda. Discovery ends on 4/6/2020.(Delius, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Colony Insurance Company. Luboslav Hvizda served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Savrin, Philip) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/16/19. (bnw) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Luboslav Hvizda. (eop) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to The Khalsa Group, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit -C -Insurance Policy

1 #2

Exhibit -B - ROR to Khalsa

1 #1

Exhibit -A -Liability Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8991344) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Liability Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B - ROR to Khalsa, #3 Exhibit -C -Insurance Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/09/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service Executed by Colony Insurance Company. The Khalsa Group, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Savrin, Philip) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by James Darren Summerville on behalf of Luboslav Hvizda (Summerville, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell Kent Thelen on behalf of Luboslav Hvizda (Thelen, Maxwell) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Luboslav Hvizda. Discovery ends on 4/6/2020.(Delius, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service Executed by Colony Insurance Company. Luboslav Hvizda served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Savrin, Philip) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/16/19. (bnw) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Luboslav Hvizda. (eop) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to The Khalsa Group, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8991344) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Liability Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B - ROR to Khalsa, #3 Exhibit -C -Insurance Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Darren Summerville

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maxwell Kent Thelen