This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2021 at 07:45:24 (UTC).

Colony Insurance Company v. Interglobal Logistics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Colony Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Interglobal Logistics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David Briones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Briones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colony Insurance Company

Defendants

Southwire Company, LLC

OSCAR PAYAN

INTERGLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Andrew Melendi

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi, LLP

2811 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75204

Matthew Rigney

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi, LLP

2811 Mckinney Av., Suite 250 West

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Andrew Bonner

Attorney at Kemp Smith LLP

P.O. Box 2800

El Paso, TX 79999-2800

Sergio M. Estrada

Attorney at Kemp Smith LLC

221 N. Kansas Suite 1700

El Paso, TX 79901

Maxey M. Scherr

Attorney at Scherr & Legate, PLLC

109 N. Oregon, 12Th Flr

El Paso, TX 79901

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #7

Proposed Order

10 #6

Exhibit A-5

10 #5

Exhibit A-4

10 #4

Exhibit A-3

10 #3

Exhibit A-2

10 #2

Exhibit A-1

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

#5

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Report by Colony Insurance Company. (Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FedEx Mail Receipt of #12 FedEx Mailing (dc) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colony Insurance Company. Oscar Payan served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FedEx Mailing of #5 Summons Issued to Oscar Payan, #11 Order on Motion to Substitute Service, #1 Complaint (dc) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Substitute Service. Signed by Judge David Briones. (dc) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Opposed MOTION to Substitute Motion for Substituted Service on Defendant Oscar Payan by Colony Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Proposed Order)(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 AND LOCAL COURT RULE CV-16. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Def Southwire Company, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Colony Insurance Company. Attorney Richard Andrew Bonner added to party Southwire Company, LLC(pty:dft) by Southwire Company, LLC.(Bonner, Richard) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colony Insurance Company. Interglobal Logistics, Inc. served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colony Insurance Company. Southwire Company, LLC served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Oscar Payan. (lc3) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Southwire Company, LLC. (lc3) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Interglobal Logistics, Inc.. (lc3) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Colony Insurance Company. (Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge SCHYDLOWER (lc3) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lc3) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14789865). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southwire Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Andrew Bonner