This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2019 at 07:36:33 (UTC).

Colonial Pipeline Company v. AIG Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Colonial Pipeline Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AIG Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00762

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colonial Pipeline Company

Defendant

AIG Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence J. Bracken, II

Laura Thayer Wagner

Alexander D. Russo

Andrea L. DeField

Michael S. Levine

Defendant Attorneys

John C. Bonnie

Joseph A. Hinkhouse

Joshua Abraham Boggioni

Stephanie A. Sauve

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#21

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#6

#5

2 #1

Summons AIG

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/05/2019
View Court Documents

(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for AIG Specialty Insurance Company by AIG Specialty Insurance Company.(Bonnie, John) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2019
View Court Documents

(#23) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 9/3/2019.(Bonnie, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2019
View Court Documents

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time for parties to serve initial disclosures and submit the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan through and including 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/22/2019. (dob) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2019
View Court Documents

(#21) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion Respecting Time of Rule 26 Conference by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bonnie, John) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

(#20) ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Stephanie A. Sauve. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/18/2019. (dob) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

(#19) ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph A. Hinkhouse. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/18/2019. (dob) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

(#18) ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua Abraham Boggioni. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/18/2019. (dob) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019
View Court Documents

APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephanie A. Sauve Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8499338). Attorney John C. Bonnie added appearing on behalf of AIG Specialty Insurance Company (jkm) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019
View Court Documents

APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua Abraham Boggioni Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8499273). Attorney John C. Bonnie added appearing on behalf of AIG Specialty Insurance Company (jkm) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019
View Court Documents

APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph A. Hinkhouse Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8499165). Attorney John C. Bonnie added appearing on behalf of AIG Specialty Insurance Company (jkm) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
02/22/2019
View Court Documents

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-00762-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 2/22/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Bracken, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Colonial Pipeline Company. AIG Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Bracken, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2019
View Court Documents

APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrea L. DeField Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8454418). Attorney Andrea L. DeField added appearing on behalf of Colonial Pipeline Company (pmb) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2019
View Court Documents

APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael S. Levine Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8454352). Attorney Michael S. Levine added appearing on behalf of Colonial Pipeline Company (pmb) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2019
View Court Documents

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colonial Pipeline Company by Colonial Pipeline Company.(Bracken, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/16/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019
View Court Documents

(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of Andrea L. DeField Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8454418)by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Court Admissions Chart and Certificate of Good Standing)(Bracken, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019
View Court Documents

(#3) APPLICATION for Admission of Michael S. Levine Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8454352)by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Court Admission Chart and Certificate of Good Standing)(Bracken, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2019
View Court Documents

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons AIG)(bnp) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2019
View Court Documents

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8448810) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less