This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 09:02:34 (UTC).

COLON v. BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 COLON filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-04078

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROLANDO JAVIER COLON

Easton, PA 18042

Defendant

BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Letter dated 10/2/20 by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON to Judge Beetlestone. (er, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/8/20.10/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ROLANDO JAVIER COLON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL..(JL ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#7

(#7) Copy of Order/Notice dated 8/26/20 (Document # 4) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to ROLANDO JAVIER COLON for the following reason: NOT IN NORTHAMPTION JAIL. (JL ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. ROLANDO JAVIER COLON SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THE CASE. THE COURT DIRECTS THE WARDEN OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY PRISON TO ASSESS AN INITIAL FILING FEE OF 20% AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY PRISON. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/14/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE OR WARDEN. (amas, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/14/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #2

Designation Form

2 #1

Case Management Track Form

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC, filed by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #9 TO PLAINTIFF. (jaa, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter dated 10/2/20 by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON to Judge Beetlestone. (er, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/8/20.10/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ROLANDO JAVIER COLON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL..(JL ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMAILED DOC #4 TO PRO SE R. COLON AT SCI DALLAS (JL ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Copy of Order/Notice dated 8/26/20 (Document # 4) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to ROLANDO JAVIER COLON for the following reason: NOT IN NORTHAMPTION JAIL. (JL ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDOCS. 5 AND 6 MAILED TO PRO SE AND FAXED TO WARDEN. (sg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. ROLANDO JAVIER COLON SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THE CASE. THE COURT DIRECTS THE WARDEN OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY PRISON TO ASSESS AN INITIAL FILING FEE OF 20% AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY PRISON. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/14/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE OR WARDEN. (amas, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/14/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (JL ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON. (bw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against BUDGET/AVIS RENTAL CAR LLC, filed by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROLANDO JAVIER COLON..(bw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less