This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:18:20 (UTC).

COLON-RODRIGUEZ v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 COLON-RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and William J. Martini. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06199

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

William J. Martini

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANA COLON-RODRIGUEZ

Defendants and Cross Claimants

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

PERRY POE 1-10 AND/IR VVV INC. 1-10

TONY TOE 1-10 AND/OR XYZ INC. 1-10

MIKE MOE 1-10 AND/OR JKL INC. 1-10

HARRY HOE 1-10 AND/OR DEF INC. 1-10

ZACK ZOE 1-10 AND/OR ZZZ INC, 1-10

LARRY LOE 1-10 AND OR RST INC. 1-10

JACK JOE 1-10 AND/OR UVW INC. 1-10

NICK NOE 1-10 AND/OR GHI INC. 1-10

MANNY MOE 1-10; BARRY BOE 1-10 AND/OR MNO INC. 1-10

FRANK FOE 1-10 AND/OR ABC INC. 1-10

WILLIAM WOE 1-10 AND/OR PDQ INC. 1-10

JOHN DOE 1-10

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PERRY POE 1-10 AND/IR VVV INC. 1-10

TONY TOE 1-10 AND/OR XYZ INC. 1-10

MIKE MOE 1-10 AND/OR JKL INC. 1-10

HARRY HOE 1-10 AND/OR DEF INC. 1-10

ZACK ZOE 1-10 AND/OR ZZZ INC, 1-10

LARRY LOE 1-10 AND OR RST INC. 1-10

JACK JOE 1-10 AND/OR UVW INC. 1-10

arbnwk

NICK NOE 1-10 AND/OR GHI INC. 1-10

MANNY MOE 1-10; BARRY BOE 1-10 AND/OR MNO INC. 1-10

FRANK FOE 1-10 AND/OR ABC INC. 1-10

WILLIAM WOE 1-10 AND/OR PDQ INC. 1-10

JOHN DOE 1-10

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREDERIC J. ROSSI

1018 Mcbride Avenue

Woodland Park, NJ 07424

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY

Attorney at Fishman McIntyre Berkeley Levine Samansky, PC

120 Eagle Rock Avenue

East Hanover, NJ 07936

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) LETTER ORDER Granting #5 Letter from Frederic J. Rossi, Esq., Scheduling Conference is rescheduled to 5/8/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/3/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter from Frederic J. Rossi, Esq.. (ROSSI, FREDERIC) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/19/19. (LM, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION from Passaic County Superior Court, case number PAS-L-3996-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9430852), filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against FRANK FOE 1-10 AND/OR ABC INC. 1-10, HARRY HOE 1-10 AND/OR DEF INC. 1-10, JACK JOE 1-10 AND/OR UVW INC. 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10, LARRY LOE 1-10 AND OR RST INC. 1-10, MANNY MOE 1-10; BARRY BOE 1-10 AND/OR MNO INC. 1-10, MIKE MOE 1-10 AND/OR JKL INC. 1-10, NICK NOE 1-10 AND/OR GHI INC. 1-10, PERRY POE 1-10 AND/IR VVV INC. 1-10, TONY TOE 1-10 AND/OR XYZ INC. 1-10, WILLIAM WOE 1-10 AND/OR PDQ INC. 1-10, ZACK ZOE 1-10 AND/OR ZZZ INC, 1-10, arbnwk by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER ORDER Granting #5 Letter from Frederic J. Rossi, Esq., Scheduling Conference is rescheduled to 5/8/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/3/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Frederic J. Rossi, Esq.. (ROSSI, FREDERIC) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/19/19. (LM, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against FRANK FOE 1-10 AND/OR ABC INC. 1-10, HARRY HOE 1-10 AND/OR DEF INC. 1-10, JACK JOE 1-10 AND/OR UVW INC. 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10, LARRY LOE 1-10 AND OR RST INC. 1-10, MANNY MOE 1-10; BARRY BOE 1-10 AND/OR MNO INC. 1-10, MIKE MOE 1-10 AND/OR JKL INC. 1-10, NICK NOE 1-10 AND/OR GHI INC. 1-10, PERRY POE 1-10 AND/IR VVV INC. 1-10, TONY TOE 1-10 AND/OR XYZ INC. 1-10, WILLIAM WOE 1-10 AND/OR PDQ INC. 1-10, ZACK ZOE 1-10 AND/OR ZZZ INC, 1-10, arbnwk by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (ak, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION from Passaic County Superior Court, case number PAS-L-3996-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9430852), filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.