This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 11:05:17 (UTC).

Colon-Perez et al v. Saint Lukes Memorial Hospital, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Colon-Perez filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Saint Lukes Memorial Hospital, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01762

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raul M. Arias-Marxuach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUZ EDITH COLON-PEREZ

VANESSA A MARTINEZ-COLON

Vanessa A. Martinez-Colon

Defendants

SIMED

Saint Lukes Memorial Hospital, Inc. doing business as St. Lukes Memorial Hospital agent of Hospital Episcopal San Lucas

Continental Casualty Insurance Co.

John Doe

Seguros Triple-S, Inc.

Continental Casualty Insurance Co. doing business as CNA doing business as CNA Casualty of Puerto Rico

Richard Roe

Saint Lukes Memorial Hospital, Inc. doing business as St. Lukes Memorial Hospital doing business as Hospital Episcopal San Lucas

Seguros Triple-S, Inc. doing business as Triple S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez

Attorney at Rodriguez Lopez Law Office

Po Box 7693

Ponce, PR 00732-7693

Defendant Attorneys

Carla Bobonis-Cabrera

Attorney at SIMED

Edif. Centro Europa, Suite 501, Ave. Ponce De Leon # 1492, Pda. 22

San Juan, PR 00907-4117

Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez

Attorney at Landron & Vera LLC

1606 Ave. Ponce De Leon, Edif. Bogoricin, Suite 501

San Juan, PR 00909

Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz

Attorney at Landron & Vera LLC

1606 Ave. Ponce De Leon, Edif. Bogoricin, Suite 501

San Juan, PR 00909

Eileen Landron-Guardiola

Attorney at Landron & Vera LLC

1606 Ave. Ponce De Leon, Edif. Bogoricin, Suite 501

San Juan, PR 00909

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Category Sheet Category

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit Summons To Be Issued

4 #2

Exhibit Summons To Be Issued

4 #3

Exhibit Summons To Be Issued

#5

5 #1

Summons

#7

#9

#10

#11

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER noted and granted #9 Motion for extension of time. Defendant Saint Luke's Memorial Hospital and/or Hospital Episcopal San Lucas, Inc. shall plead or otherwise defend by March 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/23/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of Saint Lukes Memorial Hospital, Inc. (Rodriguez-Munoz, Luis) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen Landron-Guardiola on behalf of Saint Lukes Memorial Hospital, Inc. (Landron-Guardiola, Eileen) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for extension of time until 03/24/2021 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez on behalf of Saint Lukes Memorial Hospital, Inc. Responses due by 3/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vera-Ramirez, Eduardo) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for extension of time. Defendant Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria (Simed) is hereby granted until March 19, 2021 to plead or otherwise defend. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/18/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for extension of time until March 19, 2021 to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Carla Bobonis-Cabrera on behalf of SIMED Responses due by 3/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bobonis-Cabrera, Carla) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for extension of time. Plaintiffs shall complete service of process no later than April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/22/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Continental Casualty Insurance Co., SIMED, Saint Lukes Memorial Hospital, Inc., Seguros Triple-S, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons To Be Issued re #1 Complaint, filed by Vanessa A. Martinez-Colon, Luz Edith Colon-Perez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons To Be Issued, #2 Exhibit Summons To Be Issued, #3 Exhibit Summons To Be Issued) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for extension of time until 4/30/2021 to To Serve Summons filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7134883.), filed by Luz Edith Colon-Perez, Vanessa A. Martinez-Colon. Service due by 3/30/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) Modified on 1/7/2021 to replace capital letters in docket text (mcm). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez