This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 08:35:07 (UTC).

Colon-Padilla v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Colon-Padilla filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gustavo A. Gelpi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01909

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gustavo A. Gelpi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonia L. Colon-Padilla

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jose Carlos Velez-Colon

421 Ave Munoz Rivera, Tenth Floor

Pr, PR 00918

Defendant Attorney

David O. Martorani-Dale

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Avenue, Torre Chardon, Suite 1201

Hato Rey, PR 00918

 

Court Documents

#16

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

10 #1

Notice of Appointment of Counsel in the Spanish Language

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Atty. Jose Carlos Velez-Colon is appointed to represent plaintiff Sonia L. Colon-Padilla. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appointment of Counsel in the Spanish Language)(gmm)Sent by regular mail to Plaintiff and Atty. Jose Carlos Velez-Colon. (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla, Pro se. Responses due by 10/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gmm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER: Granting as requested #17 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/4/2019. (AGF) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Sonia L. Colon-Padilla Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Velez-Colon, Jose) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct event and title (gmm). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla upon Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (ab) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appoint Process Server. The USMS shall serve summons. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/26/2019. (sc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: Granting #13 Motion requesting Order. Court-appointed counsel shall be provided access to all filings in this case. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/26/2019. (AGF) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION requesting Order filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Sonia L. Colon-Padilla Responses due by 10/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velez-Colon, Jose) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Appoint Process Server pursuant to R. CIV. P. 4(c)(3) filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Sonia L. Colon-Padilla Responses due by 10/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velez-Colon, Jose) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Department Justice & U.S. Attorneys Office (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Atty. Jose Carlos Velez-Colon is appointed to represent plaintiff Sonia L. Colon-Padilla. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appointment of Counsel in the Spanish Language)(gmm)Sent by regular mail to Plaintiff and Atty. Jose Carlos Velez-Colon. (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Granting #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court hereby appoints counsel Jose C. Velez Colon to represent plaintiff on a pro bono basis. Should plaintiff prevail, counsel may move for an award of attorneys fees under EAJA. The Clerk of Court shall notify counsel of the appointment. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/25/2019. (AGF) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/25/2019. (AGF) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT in Support of #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla, Pro se. (gmm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla, Pro se. Responses due by 10/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gmm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT, filed by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla, Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #21, #2 Exhibit #22) (gmm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT, filed by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla, Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #11, #2 Exhibit #12, #3 Exhibit #13, #4 Exhibit #14, #5 Exhibit #15, #6 Exhibit #16, #7 Exhibit #17, #8 Exhibit #18, #9 Exhibit #19, #10 Exhibit #20) (gmm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla, Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #6, #2 Exhibit #7, #3 Exhibit #8, #4 Exhibit #9, #5 Exhibit #10) (gmm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla, Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit #1, #5 Exhibit #2, #6 Exhibit #3, #7 Exhibit #4)(gmm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sonia L. Colon-Padilla, Pro se. Responses due by 10/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gmm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.