This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 09:52:19 (UTC).

Colombe v. SGN, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Colombe filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SGN, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Wier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00374

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Wier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Smith Colombe

Defendant

SGN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henrietta Gera Meyman

309 Bainbridge, Apt B

Lexington, KY 40509

Defendant Attorney

Anthony J. Caruso

Attorney at Kohnen & Patton LLP

201 E. Fifth Street, Pnc Center, 8Th Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by SGN, INC.. (** FILED PURSUANT TO QC RE DE#7 .) (MDC) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#7

(#7) ** INCORRECTLY FILED - See DE #8 for Correct Entry. ** RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony) Modified Text on 9/29/2020 (MDC). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by Angela Smith Colombe. (Meyman, Henrietta) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Caruso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C- State Court Docket

1 #2

Exhibit B- Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A- Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4766795), filed by SGN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Summons, #3 Exhibit C- State Court Docket)(SLH) Modified on 9/4/2020 (STC). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. (MDC) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Anthony J. Caruso re #7 Response in Support of re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to state a claim. Error: the reply to #5 Motion to Dismiss was incorrectly filed using the event Response in Support. Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the docket text of #7 to state, incorrectly filed. Clerk filed the reply as #8 ; In the future, contact the ECF help desk when assistance is needed to select the correct event. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR(MDC) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by SGN, INC.. (** FILED PURSUANT TO QC RE DE#7 .) (MDC) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ** INCORRECTLY FILED - See DE #8 for Correct Entry. ** RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony) Modified Text on 9/29/2020 (MDC). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by Angela Smith Colombe. (Meyman, Henrietta) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Caruso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (SLH) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4766795), filed by SGN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Summons, #3 Exhibit C- State Court Docket)(SLH) Modified on 9/4/2020 (STC). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less