Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 08:58:51 (UTC).

Colo v. NS Support, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Colo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NS Support, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald E. Bush. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00437

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald E. Bush

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brianna Colo

Defendants

NS Support, LLC doing business as Neuroscience Assoc.

NS Support, LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Neuroscience Assoc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly Lynette Williams

Attorney at Williams, Meservy & Lothspeich, LLP

153 East Main

Jerome, ID 83338

Defendant Attorney

Portia L Rauer

Attorney at Powers Farley

Po Box 9756

Boise, ID 83707

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brianna Colo. Replies due by 11/23/2020.(Williams, Kimberly)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NS Support, LLC. (Rauer, Portia)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brianna Colo, NS Support, LLC re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/21/2020. (alw)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Portia L Rauer appearing for Defendant NS Support, LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rauer, Portia)

5 #1

Affidavit

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brianna Colo. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Williams, Kimberly)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against NS Support, LLC, filed by Brianna Colo.(Williams, Kimberly)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Williams, Kimberly)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to NS Support, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2101006.), filed by Brianna Colo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Williams, Kimberly)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brianna Colo. Replies due by 11/23/2020.(Williams, Kimberly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NS Support, LLC. (Rauer, Portia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brianna Colo, NS Support, LLC re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/21/2020. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Portia L Rauer appearing for Defendant NS Support, LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rauer, Portia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brianna Colo. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Williams, Kimberly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against NS Support, LLC, filed by Brianna Colo.(Williams, Kimberly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Williams, Kimberly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to NS Support, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Brianna Colo was filed incorrectly in this case. Please refile the cover sheet with date and signature.(alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2101006.), filed by Brianna Colo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Williams, Kimberly)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Portia L Rauer