This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2021 at 09:04:40 (UTC).

Collins v. State Farm Lloyds

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Collins filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Lloyds. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00982

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craig Collins

Defendant

State Farm Lloyds

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey T Embry

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

4733 Don Drive

Dallas, TX 75247

Matt L Montgomery

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

4733 Don Drive

Dallas, TX 75247

Margaret Claire Pennell

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

515 S Vine Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Amelia Marquis

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

1717 Main Street, Suite 4200

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael C Klein

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

Ashley S Bunyard

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week docket beginning 8/15/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2021. Discovery due by 3/18/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/1/2022. Status Report due by 4/8/2022. Motions due by 4/15/2022. Pretrial Order due by 8/1/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 8/1/2022. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/1/2021) (mjr) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Craig Collins (Montgomery, Matt) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Joint Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Craig Collins. (Montgomery, Matt) Modified text on 6/1/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Lloyds. (Marquis, Amelia) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret Claire Pennell on behalf of Craig Collins. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Pennell, Margaret) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Joint Proposal for Contents of Scheduling and Discovery Order due by 5/31/2021. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 5/3/2021) (twd) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

1 #8

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #7

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #6

Exhibit(s) F

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11855921) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week docket beginning 8/15/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2021. Discovery due by 3/18/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/1/2022. Status Report due by 4/8/2022. Motions due by 4/15/2022. Pretrial Order due by 8/1/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 8/1/2022. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/1/2021) (mjr) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Craig Collins (Montgomery, Matt) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Craig Collins. (Montgomery, Matt) Modified text on 6/1/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Lloyds. (Marquis, Amelia) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret Claire Pennell on behalf of Craig Collins. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Pennell, Margaret) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Joint Proposal for Contents of Scheduling and Discovery Order due by 5/31/2021. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 5/3/2021) (twd) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11855921) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Lloyds as Subrogee of Bryan Dietzel is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margaret Claire Pennell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matt Montgomery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Todd Embry