This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2019 at 07:01:14 (UTC).

Collins v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Collins filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Hixson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-06873

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Hixson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Collins

San Pablo, CA 94806

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Wendy M. Garbers

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Ave., 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Sara Winslow

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Avenue, 9Th Floor, Box 36055

San Francisco, CA 94102

Patrick William Snyder

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#9

(#9) ORDER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#6

(#6) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/15/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Admninistrative Record in Paper and Electronic Form by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6, #7 Part 7, #8 Part 8, #9 Part 9, #10 Part 10, #11 Part 11, #12 Part 12, #13 Part 13, #14 Part 14)(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) bySocial Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Security Administration.. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 10/23/2019) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Social Security Administration re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Proof of Service (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/22/2019) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Social Security Administration re #1 Notice of Removal, (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/22/2019) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court, Small Claims - Richmond. Their case number is RSC 19-0440. (). Filed bySocial Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/22/2019) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less