This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2021 at 09:11:44 (UTC).

Collins v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Collins filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00851

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terri Sue Collins

Defendants

Sandoz, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Hospira, Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

McKesson Corporation d/b/a McKesson Packaging

Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc

Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Actavis Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.

McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging

Hospira Worldwide, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick A. Luff

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (ss) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8837653) filed by Terri Sue Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Patrick A. Luff added to party Terri Sue Collins(pty:pla).(Luff, Patrick) Modified text on 4/29/2021 (ss). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Hospira, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hospira Worldwide, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis Pharma, Inc. is a litigant