This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2021 at 09:52:05 (UTC).

Collins v. Sanofii S.A et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Collins filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofii S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81601

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regina Collins

Orlando, FL 32817

Defendants

SANOFI S.A

Inc Pfizer

Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC

Boehringer Ingelahm Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Sanofi S.A.

Pfizer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen W. Farr

Attorney at Law Office Attorney Stephen W .Farr nka Farr Cragun & Berube

205 26Th Street, Ste 24

Ogden, UT 84401

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81601-RLR Collins v. Sanofii S.A et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional party by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pes) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14994063, filed by Regina Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Farr, Stephen) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelahm Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLAXO SMITH KLINE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Inc Pfizer is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen W. Farr