This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/01/2019 at 07:45:43 (UTC).

Collins v. LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Collins filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00518

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristopher Collins

Defendants

Metrie Industries, Inc.

LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas F. Ralston

Attorney at Ralston Kinney LLC

4717 Grand Avenue, Suite 250

Kansas City, MO 64112

Kenneth D Kinney

Attorney at Ralston Kinney LLC

4717 Grand Avenue, Suite 250

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia A. Konopka

Attorney at Stinson LLP - KC 2900

1201 Walnut St., Ste. 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Erin M Naeger

Attorney at Stinson LLP - KC 2900

1201 Walnut St., Ste. 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Trevor Matthews Bond

Attorney at Case Linden PC

2600 Grand Blvd., Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64108

Patric Shane Linden

Attorney at Case Linden PC

2600 Grand Blvd., Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS (Certificate of Interest) filed by Erin M Naeger on behalf of Defendant Metrie Industries, Inc..(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer of Defendant LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC to Plaintiff's first Amended Petition on behalf of LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC.(Linden, Patric) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Patric Shane Linden on behalf of Defendant LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC.(Linden, Patric) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Patric Shane Linden on behalf of LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC (Linden, Patric) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to First Amended Petition) on behalf of Metrie Industries, Inc..(Konopka, Patricia) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/23/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 8/9/2019. Signed on 7/9/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

3 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Metrie Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Konopka, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Ricketts Decl.

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - King Decl.

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court File

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clay County Circuit Court County, case number 19CY-CV05595, filed by Patricia A. Konopka on behalf of Metrie Industries, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MOWDC-6386306. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 - King Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 - Ricketts Decl., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Konopka, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • (#10) ORDER. The parties have notified the Court that this case has reached resolution. The parties are ORDERED to file either dismissal paperwork or a joint status report by September 25, 2019. Signed on 8/22/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS (Certificate of Interest) filed by Erin M Naeger on behalf of Defendant Metrie Industries, Inc..(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer of Defendant LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC to Plaintiff's first Amended Petition on behalf of LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC.(Linden, Patric) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Patric Shane Linden on behalf of Defendant LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC.(Linden, Patric) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of appearance by Patric Shane Linden on behalf of LSI Temporary Services of Omaha, LLC (Linden, Patric) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to First Amended Petition) on behalf of Metrie Industries, Inc..(Konopka, Patricia) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/23/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 8/9/2019. Signed on 7/9/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Metrie Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Konopka, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clay County Circuit Court County, case number 19CY-CV05595, filed by Patricia A. Konopka on behalf of Metrie Industries, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MOWDC-6386306. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 - King Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 - Ricketts Decl., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Konopka, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas F. Ralston