This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2020 at 11:49:17 (UTC).

Collins v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Collins filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas E Rogers, III and Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02258

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas E Rogers, III

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalie Collins

Barnwell, SC 29812

Defendants

Commissioner of the Social Securit Administration

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Interested Party

Social Security Administrative Record

 

Court Documents

#16

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/20/2020. (dsto, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/20/2020. (prou, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 7/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 7/1/2020. (prou, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 10/19/2020. (dsto, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #14 Order Service - Non-Inmate w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Natalie Collins, 85 Virginia Ave., Barnwell, SC, 29812 (dsto, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/20/2020. (dsto, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Consent placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Natalie Collins 85 Virginia Ave. Barnwell, SC 29812 (suro, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/20/2020. (prou, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Natalie Collins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Proper Form Order and proposed documents placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Natalie Collins 85 Virginia Ave. Barnwell, SC 29812 (suro, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #6 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 7/1/2020.(prou, ) Modified on 7/2/2020 to edit text (prou, ). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 7/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 7/1/2020. (prou, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Natalie Collins. Response to Motion due by 6/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Natalie Collins. Service due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Appeals Council, #2 Envelope)(dsto, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #3 Page 2 of Complaint with Address Change for Defendant, #4 Envelope) (prou, ). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less