This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2020 at 06:40:37 (UTC).

Collins v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Collins filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Collins

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel Mason Wendt

Attorney at Wendt Law Firm PC

1100 Main St., Ste. 2610

Kansas City, MO 64105

Defendant Attorney

Richard B North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough LLP (Atlanta)

201 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys Samuel Wendt and Richard North, Jr., are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Samuel Wendt and Richard North, Jr.) (AMP) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02955. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#6

(#6) AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#4

(#4) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (Third). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13351141 filed by Brenda Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2016)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase has been referred to Magistrate Judge Guyton for related case determination. (AMP) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys Samuel Wendt and Richard North, Jr., are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Samuel Wendt and Richard North, Jr.) (AMP) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02955. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase Transferred to the Eastern District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (Third). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Brenda Collins. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-2955-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13351141 filed by Brenda Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.